Ramanda Haamid et al v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ramanda Haamid and Murad Haamid
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv02257
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc)
October 12, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiffs Murad Haamid, Ramanda Haamid. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Ramanda Haamid and Murad Haamid for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ramanda Haamid and Murad Haamid. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Murad Haamid (pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Ramanda Haamid (pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 25, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America Inc, identifying Hyundai Motor Company. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America Inc identifying Hyundai Motor Company as Corporate Parent. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
August 24, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America Hyundai Motor America Inc.(Attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost added to party Hyundai Motor America Inc(pty:dft))(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
August 8, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiffs Murad Haamid, Ramanda Haamid. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Ramanda Haamid et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Ramanda Haamid et al. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Murad Haamid (pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Ramanda Haamid (pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ramanda Haamid, Murad Haamid, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America Inc served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens, Client Representative, CSC Lawyers Incorporated, Registered Agent, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America Inc. (sh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Murad Haamid, Ramanda Haamid. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Murad Haamid, Ramanda Haamid, identifying Ramanda Haamid and Murad Haamid. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Murad Haamid, Ramanda Haamid. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34533869 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ramanda Haamid, Murad Haamid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Murad Haamid (pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Ramanda Haamid (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramanda Haamid et al v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramanda Haamid
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murad Haamid
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Represented By: Sasha Bassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?