Richard Tetsuo Osaki v. Gibson House et al
Plaintiff: Richard Tetsuo Osaki
Defendant: Gibson House and Martin
Case Number: 5:2022cv02271
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #5 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Request is DENIED. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (iv)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE:ORDER OF DISMISSAL #4 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Richard Tetsuo Osaki. (hr)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. (jtil)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Richard Tetsuo Osaki against Defendants Gibson House and Martin, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Tetsuo Osaki v. Gibson House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tetsuo Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?