Gevorg Hope v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: GEVORG HOPE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 5:2023cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gene B Sharaga has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
October 20, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Gene Sharaga may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 12/5/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant United States of America(Marquez, Christina)
October 19, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory J Agron counsel for Defendant United States of America. Gregory J. Agron is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Agron, Gregory)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING REMAINING DEADLINES AND REFERRAL TO ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the remaining dates in this case are continued as follows: Final Pretrial Conference 6/7/2024; Bench Trial 6/25/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the parties are referred to ADR Procedure No. 2 (Court Mediation Panel). (See document for additional deadlines). RE: Stipulation to Continue #27 . (aco)
October 13, 2023 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Remaining Deadlines; Request for Referral to ADR Procedure No. 2; and Declaration of Christina Marquez filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marquez, Christina)
October 6, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Christina Marquez as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Marquez, Christina)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of January 15, 2024; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of January 22, 2024.; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for March 1, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Court Trial Date of March 26, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details). (aco)
June 6, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for June 26, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. Final Pretrial Conference 03/01/24 at 1:30 p.m. Court Trial at 03/26/24 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS). (aco)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 29, 2024. (aco)
June 5, 2023 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Gevorg Hope.. (Morgan, Edward)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Agron, Gregory)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Scheduling Conference set for May 15, 2023, is continued to June 26, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. The parties Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Joint Report shall be filed by no later than June 5, 2023. (aco)
May 2, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/1/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Agron, Gregory)
May 2, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory J Agron counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Gregory J. Agron as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Gregory J Agron added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Agron, Gregory)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ONLY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Percy Anderson. This stipulation is approved. Defendant County of San Bernardino is hereby dismissed without prejudice. RE: Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant County of San Bernardino #14 . (aco)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
March 28, 2023 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for May 15, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
March 28, 2023 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant County of San Bernardino filed by Plaintiff Gevorg Hope.(Morgan, Edward)
March 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-00011-PA(SHKx). (ap)
March 2, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino.(Attorney Mitchell L Norton added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Norton, Mitchell)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant State of California pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to State of California. (Baxter, Douglas)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant State of California. (et)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of San Bernardino. (et)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (et)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C Statement of Consent) (et)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE. (Morgan, Edward)
January 4, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE. (Morgan, Edward)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE. (Morgan, Edward)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE, (Morgan, Edward)
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE. (Morgan, Edward)
January 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34561103 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GEVORG HOPE. (Attorney Edward M Morgan added to party GEVORG HOPE(pty:pla))(Morgan, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gevorg Hope v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEVORG HOPE
Represented By: Edward M Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gregory J Agron
Represented By: Christina Alejandra Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO
Represented By: Mitchell L Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?