Deshawn Chappell v.N. McDowell et al
Plaintiff: Deshawn Chappell
Defendant: N. McDowell, S. Lopez, N. Nunez, E. Davis, F. Aguilar, A.W.P. Messerli, Y. Touchton, F. Nago, V. Ayala-Herrera, J. Gonzales, C. Martinez, G. Gasgonia, R. Johnson, M. Ortega, H. Pelayo, J. Rocha, C. Barrera, G. Ephion, Armando Lopez, P. Messerli, G. Balbuena, S. Duran, A. Dohoda, E. Nunez, J. Wells, J. Montgomery, S. Cardenas and S. Gonzales
Case Number: 5:2023cv00025
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion #8 . Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint no later than 3/30/2023. The Court will defer ruling on the in forma pauperis application until he files a viable amended complaint. Plaintiff shall follow the directions set forth in the Court's January 20 Order. Failure to do so or to timely file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File First Amended Complaint by March 23, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Deshawn Chappell. (et)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court dismisses the complaint #1 with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by no later than 2/20/2023, if he wishes to proceed with this action. The amended complaint should be on this Court's form. Failure to file an amended complaint, to comply with this Order, or to remedy the deficiencies identified herein will result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or to comply with a Court Order. The Court declines to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application #3 unless and until he complies with this Order. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the Court's form for a Section 1983 complaint filed by an incarcerated person. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred to Central District of California, Eastern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Eastern Division*.*3470 12th St, 1st floor**Riverside, CA 92501*. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ave) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/10/2023.]
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deshawn Chappell. (smy1) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/10/2023.] Modified on 1/10/2023 (car).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failing to Pay Filing Fee Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) AND/OR Failing to Move to Proceed in forma pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/3/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(smy1)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/10/2023.]
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F. Aguilar, V. Ayala-Herrera, G. Balbuena, C. Barrera, S. Cardenas, E. Davis, A. Dohoda, S. Duran, G. Ephion, G. Gasgonia, J. Gonzales, S. Gonzales, R. Johnson, Armando Lopez, S. Lopez, C. Martinez, N. McDowell, A.W.P. Messerli, P. Messerli, J. Montgomery, F. Nago, E. Nunez, N. Nunez, M. Ortega, H. Pelayo, J. Rocha, Y. Touchton, J. Wells (Filing fee $402, fee not paid, IFP not filed.), filed by Deshawn Chappell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhib B-D, #3 Exhib E-F, #4 Exhib G-I, #5 Supplemental Exhibits)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1241-JAH-NLS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (smy1) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/10/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deshawn Chappell v.N. McDowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W.P. Messerli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Touchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Nago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Ayala-Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gasgonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Pelayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ephion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Messerli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Balbuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dohoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?