Jesus Jesse Cadena v. JIR Fighter, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Jesse Cadena
Defendant: JIR Fighter, Inc., Ilenya Ignacchiti and Does 1 to 50 inclusive
Case Number: 5:2023cv01512
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court and counsel confer. Counsel make their appearances. The Court order the plaintiff to give the defendant any and all contact information of medical providers by September 22, 2023. The Court sets a trial date for March 19, 2024 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (aco)
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #14 , Miscellaneous Document #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 13, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jesus Jesse Cadena (Salinas, Arturo)
September 13, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Plaintiff Jesus Jesse Cadena (Salinas, Arturo)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/18/2023 AT 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-01512 SVW(SHKx). (rn)
August 7, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Doody, Peter)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
August 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:23-cv-1512-SP. (sh)
July 31, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ilenya Ignacchiti, JIR Fighter, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Jesus Jesse Cadena.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/21/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
July 31, 2023 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #5 , Declaration #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Declaration of Peter S. Doody, Notice of Interested Parties, Demand for Jury Trial. (Doody, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc... (Doody, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Peter Doody re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc.. (Doody, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc., identifying Not Applicable. (Doody, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc.. (Doody, Peter)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2134862 Receipt No: ACACDC-35769989 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant JIR Fighter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Peter S Doody added to party JIR Fighter, Inc.(pty:dft))(Doody, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Jesse Cadena v. JIR Fighter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Jesse Cadena
Represented By: Setareh Panah
Represented By: Arturo T Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIR Fighter, Inc.
Represented By: Peter S Doody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilenya Ignacchiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?