Scott L. Kuykendall v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Scott L Kuykendall
Defendant: United States Postal Service and 1-10 DOES
Case Number: 5:2023cv01761
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Postal Service. (iv)
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Scott L Kuykendall. (Boris, Alexander)
September 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (rolm)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 filed by Plaintiff Scott L Kuykendall. (Boris, Alexander)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Boris, Alexander)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Requests was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
September 1, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
September 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Boris, Alexander)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35955767 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Scott L Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alexander B Boris added to party Scott L Kuykendall (pty:pla))(Boris, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott L. Kuykendall v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott L Kuykendall
Represented By: Alexander B Boris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?