Raquel Herrera v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Raquel Marie Herrera
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2023cv02098
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-36396572 for $402 filing fee. (Leland, Moselle)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-2098 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Denying #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case) because the filer has the ability to pay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the filer must pay the full filing fee of $402. If the filer does not comply with these instructions within 30 days, this case will be DISMISSED without prejudice. (gk)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Raquel Marie Herrera. (Leland, Moselle)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Raquel Marie Herrera. (Leland, Moselle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Raquel Marie Herrera, identifying Raquel Marie Herrera. (Leland, Moselle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Raquel Marie Herrera. (Leland, Moselle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Raquel Marie Herrera. (Attorney Moselle Celia Leland added to party Raquel Marie Herrera(pty:pla))(Leland, Moselle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raquel Herrera v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Marie Herrera
Represented By: Moselle Celia Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?