Leihinahina Sullivan v. Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I
Plaintiff: Leihinahina Sullivan
Defendant: Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I
Case Number: 5:2023cv02445
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED REDACTED COMPLAINT against Defendant Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I, amending Complaint #1 , filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan(hr)
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan. (hr)
January 18, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan. (hr)
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 Text Only Entry re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #6 . SEALED COMPLAINT has been mailed by US POSTAL SERVICE separately to Plaintiff's address of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [ECF NO. 5] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (Attachments: #1 CV60P) (dc)
December 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to get a copy of ECF No.1 and REQUEST for Extension of Time of due date 12/29/2023 to comply to ECF No.4 filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan. (et)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re: Complaint #1 . To protect any personally identifying information, the Court will SEAL Plaintiff's Complaint since it contains several non-party phone numbers, including those of family members. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a redacted amended complaint that complies the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules no later than December 29, 2023. (see document for further details) (hr)
December 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 (car)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I pursuant to Bivens. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $405 Due), filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leihinahina Sullivan v. Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leihinahina Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Victorville Camp FCI Med, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?