Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. T and D Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund and Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
Defendant: T and D Services Inc. a Nevada corporation doing business as T and D Trenchless
Case Number: 5:2024cv00083
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Judgment as to T & D Services Inc., a Nevada corporation doing business in California as "T & D Trenchless" filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Judgment)(Thompson, Andrew)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before March 18, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a request for the entry of default with respect to the applicable Defendant(s). Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, upon Defendant T and D Services Inc. served on 2/3/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kylie Van Dyke - Project Manager in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Thompson, Andrew)
January 18, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marija Kristich Decker counsel for Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. Adding Marija Kristich Decker as counsel of record for Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, et al.. (Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla))(Decker, Marija)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant T and D Services Inc. (et)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, (Thompson, Andrew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Thompson, Andrew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Thompson, Andrew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36729369 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust. (Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla))(Thompson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. T and D Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Represented By: Susan Graham Lovelace
Represented By: Andrew Quinn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and D Services Inc. a Nevada corporation doing business as T and D Trenchless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?