Joseph Ramirez v. County of Riverside et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Ramirez
Defendant: County of Riverside, Edward Delgado, James Krachmer, Shannon Flakes, M. Correa, A. Rubalcava and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2024cv00402
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 Defendants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants County of Riverside, Shannon Flakes, A. Rubalcava, identifying Joseph RamirezPlaintiff County of RiversidePublic Entity Defendant Corrections Assistant Sheriff Edward DelgadoDefendant Corrections Operations Chief Deputy James KrachmerDefendant Corrections Captain Shannon FlakesDefendant Correctional Deputy M. CorreaDefendant Correctional Deputy Trainee Alan RubalcavaDefendant. (Attorney Kayleigh Ann Andersen added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Kayleigh Ann Andersen added to party Shannon Flakes(pty:dft), Attorney Kayleigh Ann Andersen added to party A. Rubalcava(pty:dft))(Andersen, Kayleigh)
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendants County of Riverside, Shannon Flakes, A. Rubalcava.(Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Shannon Flakes(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party A. Rubalcava(pty:dft))(Ramirez, Eugene)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
February 26, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez, upon Defendant County of Riverside served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Theresa Powell (Clerk Assistant) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Packer, Trenton)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez, upon Defendant A. Rubalcava served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shelly Wolf (Senior Sheriff's Records Clerk) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Packer, Trenton)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez, upon Defendant Shannon Flakes served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shelly Wolf (Senior Sheriff's Records Clerk) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Packer, Trenton)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants M. Correa, County of Riverside, Edward Delgado, Shannon Flakes, James Krachmer, A. Rubalcava. (Attachments: #1 CountyofRiverside) (jtil)
February 21, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez. (Packer, Trenton)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez. (Packer, Trenton)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez, identifying County of Riverside; Edward Delgado; James Krachmer; Shannon Flakes; M. Correa; A. Rubalcava; DOES 1-10, Inclusive. (Packer, Trenton)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez. (Packer, Trenton)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36952197 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Ramirez. (Attorney Trenton C. Packer added to party Joseph Ramirez(pty:pla))(Packer, Trenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Ramirez v. County of Riverside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ramirez
Represented By: Trenton C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Kayleigh Ann Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Krachmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Flakes
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Kayleigh Ann Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Rubalcava
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Kayleigh Ann Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?