Charles Wilson Jackson v. Patton State Hospital
Plaintiff: Charles Wilson Jackson
Defendant: Patton State Hospital
Case Number: 5:2024cv00903
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEEDIN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the filer must do the following: Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint. See the attached statement., re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #4 (bm)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Charles Wilson Jackson. (hr)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . (ghap)
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Patton State Hospital pursuant to Case assigned to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by plaintiff Charles Wilson Jackson. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Wilson Jackson v. Patton State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wilson Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patton State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?