Angela May Moore v. Martin O Malley
Plaintiff: Angela May Moore
Defendant: Martin J. O Malley
Case Number: 5:2024cv01862
Filed: August 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin J. O Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Martin J. O Malley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeals by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The Court sets the following briefing schedule pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for the Review of Social Security Decisions under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g): a. Defendant must file and serve an Answer no later than October 29, 2024; b. Plaintiff must file and serve Plaintiff's Brief no later than December 2, 2024; c. Defendant must file and serve Commissioner's Brief no later than January 2, 2025; and d. Plaintiff may file an optional Reply Brief no later than January 16, 2025. (tsn)
September 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (et)
August 30, 2024 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela May Moore, (Yancey, Martha)
August 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela May Moore. (Yancey, Martha)
August 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38127604 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Angela May Moore. (Attorney Martha Woods Yancey added to party Angela May Moore(pty:pla))(Yancey, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela May Moore v. Martin O Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela May Moore
Represented By: Martha Woods Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O Malley
Represented By: Jennifer Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?