United States Of America v. Salvador Gonzalez
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Salvador Gonzalez
Case Number: 5:2024cv02106
Filed: October 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
October 4, 2024 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Salvador Gonzalez. (car)
October 4, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
October 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. Related Case(s): 5:23-cr-00035-JGB (Pribe, Andrew)
October 2, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
October 2, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party United States Of America(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Salvador Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Andrew Pribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?