Sandra Clorinda Cody v. Martin J. O Malley
Plaintiff: Sandra Clorinda Cody
Defendant: Martin J. O Malley
Case Number: 5:2024cv02264
Filed: October 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g), RULE 4(b) (mj) filed by Defendant Martin J. O Malley. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, #6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, #7 Non Disability Related Development, #8 Disability Related Development Part1, #9 Disability Related Development Part2, #10 Disability Related Development Part3, #11 Medical Records Part 1, #12 Medical Records Part 2, #13 Medical Records Part 3, #14 Medical Records Part 4, #15 Medical Records Part 5, #16 Medical Records Part 6, #17 Medical Records Part 7, #18 Medical Records Part 8, #19 Medical Records Part 9, #20 Medical Records Part 10, #21 Medical Records Part 11, #22 Medical Records Part 12, #23 Medical Records Part 13, #24 Medical Records Part 14, #25 Medical Records Part 15, #26 Medical Records Part 16, #27 Medical Records Part 17, #28 Medical Records Part 18, #29 Medical Records Part 19, #30 Medical Records Part 20, #31 Medical Records Part 21, #32 Medical Records Part 22, #33 Medical Records Part 23, #34 Medical Records Part 24, #35 Medical Records Part 25, #36 Medical Records Part 26, #37 Medical Records Part 27, #38 Medical Records Part 28, #39 Medical Records Part 29, #40 Medical Records Part 30, #41 Medical Records Part 31, #42 Medical Records Part 32, #43 Medical Records Part 33, #44 Medical Records Part 34, #45 Medical Records Part 35, #46 Medical Records Part 36, #47 Medical Records Part 37, #48 Medical Records Part 38)(Tarn, Jennifer)
November 6, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 5:24-cv-02264 JDW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin J. O Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Martin J. O Malley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
October 24, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Sandra Clorinda Cody. (Benavides, Francesco)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The parties are directed to comply with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective 12/1/22, as well as the Local Civil Rules of this Court and the Fed. R. Civ. P., as applicable, in presenting the matter for decision by the Court. All briefs must comply with the Local Rules, including Local Civil Rules 11-6.1 and 11-6.2. by Magistrate Judge John D. Early THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mba) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
October 23, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sandra Clorinda Cody, (Benavides, Francesco)
October 23, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sandra Clorinda Cody. (Benavides, Francesco)
October 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38454436 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Sandra Clorinda Cody. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Sandra Clorinda Cody(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra Clorinda Cody v. Martin J. O Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Clorinda Cody
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O Malley
Represented By: Jennifer Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?