Gary S. Hann v. Christopher Compton et al
Plaintiff: Gary Steven Hann
Defendant: Christopher Compton and Donna Compton
Case Number: 5:2025cv00165
Filed: January 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (iv)
February 4, 2025 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:25-cv-00165 FMO(SHKx). (rn)
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Christopher Compton, Donna Compton. (car)
January 18, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann (car)
January 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Christopher Compton, Donna Compton. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 405 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary S. Hann v. Christopher Compton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Steven Hann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?