United States of America v. Real Property Located in Riverside California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located in Riverside California
Case Number: 5:2025cv00347
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2025 Filing 10 Text Only Entry re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexei Marc Schacht #8 pursuant to the Court's directive: The Court, having determined whether the required fee has been paid, and having reviewed the Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by Alexei Marc Schacht of LAW OFFICE OF ALEXEI SCHACHT for permission to appear and participate in this case on behalf of Defendant Real Property Located in Riverside California and designating as Local Counsel Gina Chodler of Law & Mediation Offices of Gina L. Chodler, HEREBY ORDERS THAT the Application be: GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2025 Filing 9 Notice Notice of Claim filed by Defendant Real Property Located in Riverside California. (Chodler, Gina)
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexei Marc Schacht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Real Property Located in Riverside California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/27/2025, Receipt No. 39396274) filed by Local Counsel for Defendant Real Property Located in Riverside California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Gina L Chodler added to party Real Property Located in Riverside California(pty:dft)) (Chodler, Gina)
February 14, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lis Pendens)(Moeser, Margaret)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 10, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 10, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff U.S. Department of Justice, Criminal Division. (Moeser, Margaret)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff U.S. Department of Justice, Criminal Division. (Attorney Margaret Amalia Moeser added to party U.S. Department of Justice, Criminal Division(pty:pla))(Moeser, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located in Riverside California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Margaret Amalia Moeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located in Riverside California
Represented By: Alexei Marc Schacht
Represented By: Gina L Chodler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?