Pamela Overfield et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Rodney L Jacobson, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Heidi M Caccamise, Patrick D Zellar, William R Cathcart, Susanna W Yu, Francis Michael Dulay, Guadalupe Guzman, Nathan Correa, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Concela Tarver, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Mike Lindeblad, Stephen E Willis, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Petra Gilmore, Charles B Thompson, Corbett L Laurie, Nancy Dittemore, Catherine D Carr, Laurie Roos, Marcus Hughes, Mike A Dauden, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Nicholas P Halapoff, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Debra Delores Bruton, Allison McLane, Linda Collier, Jason Edward Math, Anthony Aguilar, Dreama Brown, Paula Pena, Vahid Salehi, Jeffry Leroy Mather, Jack D Campbell, Russell Csonka, Jean Paradis, Susan Corner, Alan Rhein, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Diana L Brown, David M Maxon, Barbara Roberson, Anup Arne Chandiram, David Garibay, Allen Patch David, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Anh Ha, Arla M Chalmers, Patricia Bauer, David Valencia, Jeffrey T Liew, David R Fellner, Junior Kwon, Martin Roach, Candance Jones, Ingrid Escalante, Estevan Chantes, James Horton, Jr, James Flanagan, Mario M Estrada, Sumrina R Ahmed, Cynthia Garcia, Nate Maher Habbas, Miguel A Valle, Michael A Madison, Kevin T Hsu, Vicki J Walsh, Michael Holbrook, Sally Betancourt, Crystal Siraton, Sandra Lewis, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Roxanne Joyce Castro, Robin Brown, Deanne Ruelas, Benita Beshoar, Kenneth R Holz, Shay Kosta, Katherine Renee Meza, Kristin Scott, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Imelda A Bretado, Tammy Byrd, Rachael Hartley, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Linsee Lear, Dean Damron, Ruben Amaro, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Valerie Derry, Karen Walsh, Chante M Irvin, Sohail K Moosani and James Harrington
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2010cv01085
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Filing 48 Copy of Letter of Acknowledged Receipt of Order Remand with Civil Docket Sheet sent to Orange County Superior Court, Central Justice Center at Santa Ana by Deputy Clerk on 9/27/2010. (jp)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #10 and remands this action to Orange County Superior Court, Case No. 30-2010 00377574 for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 , Request for Judicial Notice #9 , and Motion to Stay #18 are denied as moot. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (Attachments: #1 CV-103 Remand Transmittal Letter) (gk)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV10-04761 PA (PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge David O. Carter to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV10-01085 PA (PJWx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson. (rrp)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both theCourt and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (See order for further details) (yl)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Read this Order carefully. It controls the case and differs in some respects from the Local Rules.(mg)
September 15, 2010 Filing 43 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 . A proposed Order Re: Transfer Pursuant to General Order 08-05 (Related Case) will be prepared as this matter is related to CV10-04761-PA (PJWx). The above-referenced Motion is held in abeyance pending the low number process, to be rescheduled for hearing if appropriate. Court Reporter: not reported. (rla)
September 14, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. Related Case(s): 10-cv-04761;10-cv-01378;10-cv-01098 (Beneli, Liana)
September 13, 2010 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: Cause called and counsel state their appearances. This matter is recalled and counsel inform the Court that it would be appropriate to request a low number transfer of this case to Judge Anderson. The Court continues this matter to 9/15/10 at 7:30 a.m. The hearings re Motion or Report and Recommendation deadlines originally scheduled have been rescheduledCourt Reporter: Jane Sutton, Deborah Parker. (twdb)
August 26, 2010 Filing 40 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 26, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Beneli, Liana)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: taking under advisement #10 Motion to Remand Case to State Court. The Court finds the matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local R. 7-15. The hearing set for August 30, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. is taken off calendar. (ade)
August 25, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions (L.R. 83-1.4) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 24, 2010 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Liana Beneli in opposition to MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 Amended Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. (Beneli, Liana)
August 23, 2010 Filing 35 Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. (Beneli, Liana)
August 23, 2010 Filing 34 Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Beneli, Liana)
August 23, 2010 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Alison S. Hightower Supplemental in Support of APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 #24 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Hightower, Alison)
August 23, 2010 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Lindbergh Porter, Jr. Supplemental in Opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y and Z)(Porter, Lindbergh)
August 23, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response (non-motion), #29 , Errata #30 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 19, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. correcting Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion) #29 (Beneli, Liana)
August 19, 2010 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Allison McLane, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellarto APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Beneli, Liana)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Taking Matter Under Submission. Before the Court is the following matter: Defendants Motion to Dismiss, to Strike, and for More Definite Statement #5 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set August 23, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. is removed from the calendar. (db)
August 18, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE OF LODGING filed ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTFFS' MOTION TO REMAND COMPLAINT re APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 #24 (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 18, 2010 Filing 26 DECLARATION of ALISON S. HIGHTOWER SUPPORT APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 #24 DECLARATION OF ALISON S. HIGHTOWER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 18, 2010 Filing 25 DECLARATION of LINDBERGH PORTER, JR. SUPPORT APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 #24 DECLARATION OF LINDBERGH PORTER, JR. IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTON TO REMAND COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 18, 2010 Filing 24 APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Complaint from August 30, 2010 to October 18, 2010 filed by DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter RE-SETTING HEARING TIME: On its own motion, the Court reschedules the following matter, presently set for August 23, 2010, at 8:30 a.m., to that same date at 10:00 a.m.: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 . (rla)
August 16, 2010 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liana Beneli in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defenant's Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Beneli, Liana)
August 16, 2010 Filing 21 DECLARATION of LINDBERGH PORTER, JR. SUPPORT MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 DECLARATION OF LINDBERGH PORTER, JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 16, 2010 Filing 20 DECLARATION of ALISON S. HIGHTOWER SUPPORT OF MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE #18 DECLARATION OF ALISON S. HIGHTOWER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 16, 2010 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 16, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE filed by DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 12, 2010 Filing 17 DECLARATION of ALISON S. HIGHTOWER OPPOSITION MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 DECLARATION OF ALISON S. HIGHTOWER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 12, 2010 Filing 16 DECLARATION of LINDBERGH PORTER OPPOSITION MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 DECLARATION OF LINDBERGH PORTER, JR. IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 12, 2010 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 9, 2010 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 WELLS FARGO'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENTS filed by DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 9, 2010 Filing 13 REPLY SUPPORT MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
August 2, 2010 Filing 12 Opposition in opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. (Beneli, Liana)
August 2, 2010 Filing 11 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying McLane, et al. and Wells Fargo Bank. (Beneli, Liana)
August 2, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Ruben Amaro, Patricia Bauer, Benita Beshoar, Sally Betancourt, Imelda A Bretado, Diana L Brown, Dreama Brown, Robin Brown, Debra Delores Bruton, Tammy Byrd, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Jack D Campbell, Catherine D Carr, Roxanne Joyce Castro, William R Cathcart, Arla M Chalmers, Anup Arne Chandiram, Estevan Chantes, Linda Collier, Susan Corner, Nathan Correa, Jason Andrew Corsentino, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Valerie Derry, Nancy Dittemore, Francis Michael Dulay, Ingrid Escalante, Mario M Estrada, David R Fellner, James Flanagan, Dawn Michelle Friesell, Cynthia Garcia, David Garibay, Petra Gilmore, Carlos Alberto Gomez, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nate Maher Habbas, Nicholas P Halapoff, James Harrington, Rachael Hartley, Michael Holbrook, Kenneth R Holz, James Horton, Jr, Kevin T Hsu, Jimmy Yee Ping Huang, Marcus Hughes, Chante M Irvin, Rodney L Jacobson, Candance Jones, Shay Kosta, Junior Kwon, Corbett L Laurie, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, Jeffrey T Liew, Mike Lindeblad, Michael A Madison, Jason Edward Math, Jeffry Leroy Mather, David M Maxon, Susan Thuy McGuinness, Katherine Renee Meza, Stacey Kathryn Montague, Sohail K Moosani, Claudia Ocegueda, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Paula Pena, Alan Rhein, Martin Roach, Barbara Roberson, Laurie Roos, Deanne Ruelas, Vahid Salehi, Kristin Scott, Shahab Munir Siddiqui, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, Charles B Thompson, David Valencia, Marco Antonio Valenzuela, Miguel A Valle, Arlene M Villarin-Simonian, Karen Walsh, Vicki J Walsh, Stephen E Willis, Susanna W Yu, Patrick D Zellar. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beneli, Liana)
July 23, 2010 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
July 23, 2010 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Thomas R. Kaufman In Support of MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Porter, Lindbergh)
July 23, 2010 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Lindbergh Porter, Jr. In Support of MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Porter, Lindbergh)
July 23, 2010 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement #5 In Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Porter, Lindbergh)
July 23, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss to Strike and for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Porter, Lindbergh)
July 19, 2010 Filing 2 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, re Notice of Removal, #1 Declaration of Lindbergh Porter, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Interested Parties, etc. served on July 16, 2010. (Hightower, Alison)
July 16, 2010 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Lindbergh Porter, Jr re Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (twdb)
July 16, 2010 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, identifying Other Affiliate WFS Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. (twdb)
July 16, 2010 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Wells Fargo Bank NA amending complaint #1 ,filed by plaintiffs Anthony Aguilar, Sumrina R Ahmed, Benita Beshoar, Dreama Brown, Heidi M Caccamise, Caryn Elizabeth Camerano, Anup Arne Chandiram, Nathan Correa, Russell Csonka, Dean Damron, Mike A Dauden, Allen Patch David, Nancy Dittemore, Eric Griffiths, Jr, Guadalupe Guzman, Anh Ha, Nicholas P Halapoff, Candance Jones, Linsee Lear, Sandra Lewis, David M Maxon, Pamela Overfield, Jean Paradis, Martin Roach, Kristin Scott, Crystal Siraton, Concela Tarver, et al (twdb)
July 16, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 00377574 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (Filing fee $ 350 paid), filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA.(twdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamela Overfield et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L Jacobson
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Ocegueda
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Overfield
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M Caccamise
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D Zellar
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Cathcart
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna W Yu
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Michael Dulay
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Guzman
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Correa
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Valenzuela
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concela Tarver
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene M Villarin-Simonian
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Lindeblad
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E Willis
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Gomez
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra Gilmore
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B Thompson
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corbett L Laurie
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Dittemore
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine D Carr
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Roos
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Hughes
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike A Dauden
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Yee Ping Huang
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas P Halapoff
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Andrew Corsentino
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Delores Bruton
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison McLane
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Collier
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Edward Math
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Aguilar
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreama Brown
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Pena
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahid Salehi
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffry Leroy Mather
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack D Campbell
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Csonka
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Paradis
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Corner
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Rhein
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Michelle Friesell
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana L Brown
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Maxon
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Roberson
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anup Arne Chandiram
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Garibay
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Patch David
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Kathryn Montague
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anh Ha
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arla M Chalmers
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bauer
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Valencia
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Liew
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Fellner
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Kwon
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Roach
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candance Jones
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Escalante
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estevan Chantes
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Horton, Jr
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Flanagan
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario M Estrada
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumrina R Ahmed
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Garcia
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Maher Habbas
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Valle
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Madison
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T Hsu
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki J Walsh
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holbrook
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Betancourt
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Siraton
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lewis
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahab Munir Siddiqui
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Joyce Castro
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Brown
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Ruelas
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Beshoar
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Holz
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shay Kosta
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Renee Meza
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Scott
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Griffiths, Jr
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda A Bretado
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Byrd
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Hartley
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryn Elizabeth Camerano
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linsee Lear
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Damron
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Amaro
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Thuy McGuinness
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Derry
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Walsh
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chante M Irvin
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sohail K Moosani
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harrington
Represented By: Liana Beneli
Represented By: David L Cheng
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Richard H Rahm
Represented By: Lindbergh Porter, Jr
Represented By: Alison Sue Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?