CardFlex Inc v. Protection Junction LLC et al
Plaintiff: CardFlex Inc
Defendant: Hamilton Edward Spear, Protection Junction LLC, Daniel Edward Powell, Brian Snodgrass, DOES 1 through DOE 20, inclusive, Hamilton Tony Spear and Tyler Williams
Not Classified By Court: Collect Co and Silverado IP, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2010cv01556
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Marc L Goldman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT filed by creditor Collect Co. RE: APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 #38 . (twdb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 39 JUDGMENT by Clerk of Court, in favor of Collect Co against Protection Junction LLC, Hamilton Edward Spear. Related to: APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 #38 . (twdb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 filed by Assignee & Judgment Creditor Collect Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Renewal of Judgment by Clerk, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Notice of Renewal of Judgment) (Phan, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 #35 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The lodged proposed renewal of judgment and lodged notice of renewal of judgment by clerk should be attached to the Application for Renewal. The application should not be proposed and will not be signed by the clerk. (twdb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Renewal of Judgment filed by Assignee & Judgment Creditor Collect Co. (Phan, Andrew)
May 4, 2021 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 filed by Assignee & Judgment Creditor Collect Co. (Phan, Andrew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Application and Supporting Documents should be in Pleading format and not State Court Forms There is no Proposed Renewal of Judgment by Clerk submitted No Declaration, Memorandum/other supporting documents submitted No Renewal of Judgment by Clerk submitted Please see case 2:95cv03193 RSWL Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation vs David Jeff Brose - refer to docket 52 - Application and Supporting documents and dockets 57 - Renewal of Judgment by Clerk and dkt 58 - Notice of Renewal of Judgment for an example Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that the entered date is incorrect and should be 05/11/2011. Please re-submit your Application For Renewal of Judgment ASAP. (shb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Renewal of Judgment re Judgment, #26 filed by Assignee & Judgment Creditor Collect Co. (Attorney Andrew Phan added to party Collect Co(pty:cr)) (Phan, Andrew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Assignee & Judgment Creditor Collect Co. (Phan, Andrew)
October 21, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Assignee and Judgment Creditor Silverado IP, Inc.. (Lazo, Marc)
May 19, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #29 , Miscellaneous Document #28 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Documents relating to Abstracts of Judgments shall be filed in the traditional form rather than electronically. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
May 17, 2011 Filing 29 Abstract of Judgment for Defendant Protection Junction, LLC filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc re: Judgment, #26 (Dean, Eric)
May 17, 2011 Filing 28 Abstract of Judgment for Hamilton Edward Spears filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc re: Judgment, #26 (Dean, Eric)
May 17, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Judgment, re: Judgment, #26 , Order #25 , filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dean, Eric)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney,Granting MOTION for Summary Judgment as to outstanding amounts due to Plaintiff #19 (twdb)
May 9, 2011 Filing 26 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, in favor of CardFlex Inc against Protection Junction LLC, Hamilton Edward Spear aka Hamilton Tony Spear in the amount of $1,425,460.50. Defendants shall be jointly and severally liable for the amount of the judgment. Plaintiff shall recover its costs. Related to: Order #25 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
May 9, 2011 Filing 24 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Motion hearing held. Court confers with counsel regarding no objection filed by Defendants.granting #19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Jane Sutton. (twdb)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: DISMISSING DEFENDANTS AND CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41 [both filed 4/15/11]. Court, on its ownmotion, DISMISSES Mr. Williams, Mr. Snodgrass, and Mr. Powell as defendants and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims for unjust enrichment, money had and received, and account stated. (rla)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: CONTINUING HEARNG FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #19 : The Court, continues the hearing for Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment to May 9, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing currently scheduled forApril 25, 2011 is hereby vacated and taken off calendar. (rla)
April 15, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 3rd, 4th and 5th Causes of Action filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc. (Dean, Eric)
April 15, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Daniel Edward Powell, Brian Snodgrass, Tyler Williams filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc. (Dean, Eric)
March 16, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to outstanding amounts due to Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4a, #9 Exhibit 4b, #10 Exhibit 4c)(Dean, Eric)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED: The Court ORDERS Defendant Protection Junction, LLC to show cause in writing no later than March 13, 2011 why default should not be entered against it for failure to retain counsel in accordance with the Court's order dated January 26, 2011. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by defendant is due. (rla)
January 28, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #14 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dg)
January 27, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #13 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dg)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #12 Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Karie J Boyd and Dolores A Contreras terminated. Accordingly, Protection Junction LLC is HEREBY NOTIFIED that they have 30 days from the date this Order is filed to obtain new counsel and have counsel file a notice of appearance. (rla)
January 26, 2011 Filing 14 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Protection Junction LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION of BOYD CONTRERAS LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #12 served on January 26, 2011. (Contreras, Dolores)
January 25, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Protection Junction LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION of BOYD CONTRERAS LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #12 served on January 25, 2011. (Contreras, Dolores)
January 25, 2011 Filing 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION of BOYD CONTRERAS LLP to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Protection Junction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dolores Contreras in Support of Motion to Withdrawal as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Contreras, Dolores)
January 11, 2011 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff CardFlex Inc.. (Dean, Eric)
November 15, 2010 Filing 10 ANSWER to Notice of Removal, #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams.(Contreras, Dolores)
November 1, 2010 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendants Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams.(Contreras, Dolores)
November 1, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJ Pilot case from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges SACV10-01556 CJC (MLGx). (at)
October 29, 2010 Filing 7 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams. (Contreras, Dolores)
October 26, 2010 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendants Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams.(Contreras, Dolores)
October 20, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by Defendants Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams. (Boyd, Karie)
October 20, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Daniel Edward Powell, Protection Junction LLC, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear, Tyler Williams. (Boyd, Karie)
October 13, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Civil Consent Pilot Project. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (lwag)
October 13, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Protection Junction LLC, Daniel Edward Powell, Brian Snodgrass, Hamilton Edward Spear and Tyler Williams. (lwag) (lwag).
October 13, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court Central Justice Center, case number 30-2010-00405843 with copy of summons and complaint. (Filing fee $ 350 Paid). Filed by Defendants Protection Junction LLC, Tyler Williams, Hamilton Edward Spear, Brian Snodgrass and Daniel Edward Powell.(lwag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2010: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6) (lwag).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CardFlex Inc v. Protection Junction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Edward Spear
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protection Junction LLC
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Edward Powell
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Snodgrass
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through DOE 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Tony Spear
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Williams
Represented By: Karie J Boyd
Represented By: Dolores A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Collect Co
Represented By: Andrew Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Silverado IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CardFlex Inc
Represented By: Andrew Phan
Represented By: Chanel Louise Oldham
Represented By: Eric David Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?