Meggitt San Juan Capistrano Inc v. Nie Yongzhong et al

Plaintiff: Meggitt San Juan Capistrano Inc
Defendant: Xiamen Niell Electroncs Co Ltd and Nie Yongzhong
Case Number: 8:2013cv00239
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Referring Judge: Marc L. Goldman
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick (twdb)
February 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying 7 Ex Parte Application for TRO. To the extent that Plaintiff wishes to pursue injunctive relief, the Court sets a hearing on the matter for March 25, 2013, at 8:30am. Plaintiff will file a Motion for Preliminary Injunction at least28 days prior to the hearing date, and oppositions and replies may be filed according to deadlines set out in the Local Rules. (twdb)
July 9, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
November 3, 2014 376 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 266 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting in part 301 Motion to Dismiss Case. For the reasons explained above, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration . To the extent that the Court previously found that Meggitt PLC was a necessary and indispensable party, Minute Order (Dkt. 244) at 813, the July 17, 2014 order is VACATED. Because Meggitt PLC need not be joined, the Court continues to have divers ity jurisdiction over this action. Consequently, the parties' arguments as to whether the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims are MOOT. The Court DENIES in part and GRANTS in part Defendants' Moti on to Dismiss. The Motion to Dismiss the federal Section 43(a) claim is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss the California Unfair Competition Law claim is GRANTED. The UCL claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs may file a Fourth Amended Complaint on or before November 17, 2014. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (see document for details). (dro)
April 21, 2015 604 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting in part and denying in part 480 Motion for Sanctions. A hearing will be held on May 4, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. to determine the final amount of the sanctions award. (twdb)
May 6, 2015 716 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Re: Monetary Sanctions 480 . The Court awards sanctions in the amount of $91,749 in expenses caused by Defendants failures to comply with Court orders to be paid by the Defendants Nie Yongzhong and Xiamen Niell Electronics Co. to Plaintiffs Meggitt (Orange County) and Meggitt (Maryland) within 30 days of this Order. (See Order for additional information). (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meggitt San Juan Capistrano Inc v. Nie Yongzhong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meggitt San Juan Capistrano Inc
Represented By: Dickstein Shapiro LLP
Represented By: Lawrence Robert LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Niell Electroncs Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nie Yongzhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.