Anthony Martini et al v. Rodin Rooyani et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Martini and Annette Martini
Defendant: Rodin Rooyani, George C. Zoley, Andrew Kishlock, R. Smith, Debbie Leon, James Black, Sheriff of San Bernardino County John McMahon, Rose Collantes Peters, Barbara Ann Hale, Nelson Ramiz, SR, San Bernardino Sheriff's Department, Santa Ana Police Department, Mark Joven, Christina Holland, San Bernardino County, Nelson Ramiz, JR, Hugh G. Mullane, City of Santa Ana, Diana Suzanne Corbett, Santa Ana City Jail, Lorraine J. Munoz, John Finnegan, Wesley Lee, Jason Aguilar, Brian M. O'Leary, The GEO Group Inc., Spectrum Security Services, Inc., Megan Berry Herndon, Century Quality Management Inc., Andre Quinones, Timothy S. Robins, City of Adelanto, Jose Barr, Edward Harris, Sam Menlo, Scott D. Laurent, Sam B. Ersan, Deborah H. Workeneh, Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jane Doe's and John Doe's From 1-250, City of Costa Mesa, Gary D. Mulphrus, Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi, Costa Mesa Country Club, Mesa Verde Partners, Hector Almaraz, Costa Mesa Motor Inn, Adelanto Detention Facility, Edward R. Grant, John Morton, Former Sheriff's of San Bernardino - Rod Hoops, Riccardo Richiez, Briana Camille Corso, Falcon Air Express Inc., Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin and Costa Mesa Police Department
Case Number: 8:2015cv00219
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert N Block
Referring Judge: David O Carter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter Re Order of Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. On March 26, 2015, this Court granted Defendants motions to dismiss, but gave Plaintiff Annette Martini an opportunity to file an amended complaint by April 10, 2015 (Dkt. 32). As of the writing of this order, Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint or any other papers. Thus, the Court orders that Plaintiffs case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jtil)
March 26, 2015 Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #8 #10 #11 ; Denying as Moot City of Adelanto's Motion to #27 ; and Dismissing Claims as to All Defendants (mt)
March 12, 2015 Filing 31 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/30/2015 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2015 Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/23/2015 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2015 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant City of Adelanto, re Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #28 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #27 (Donegan, Patrick)
March 11, 2015 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #27 filed by Defendant City of Adelanto. (Attachments: #1 Supplement A)(Donegan, Patrick)
March 11, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by City of Adelantos Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint; Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support Thereof City of Adelanto. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Patrick T Donegan added to party City of Adelanto(pty:dft))(Donegan, Patrick)
March 9, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Federal Defendants Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #20 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File. Before the Court are two request for extensions of time to file initial responsive pleadings, filed by defendants Hector Almaraz and James Black, R. Smith, and The GEO Group, Inc. (Dkt. 17, 20). Plaintiffs have named over fifty defendants in this suit. The Court currently has three pending motions to dismiss. See Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. 8, 10, 11). The requests for extensions of time are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants (including Almaraz, Black, Smith, and The GEO Group) are NOT REQUIRED to respond to the Complaint prior to the Court's ruling on the pending Motions to Dismiss. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (dro)
March 3, 2015 Filing 24 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Larry Rothman on behalf of Defendant Sam Menlo (Rothman, Larry)
March 2, 2015 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg counsel for Defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley. Adding Kristina Doan Gruenberg as attorney as counsel of record for The Geo Group, Inc. (Also sued herein as Adelanto Detention Facility), George C. Zoley, James Black, R. Smith for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The Geo Group, Inc., George C. Zoley, James Black, R. Smith. (Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party James Black(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party R. Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party The GEO Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party George C. Zoley(pty:dft))(Gruenberg, Kristina)
March 2, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley. Related Case(s): CV09-0096 AG-AN; CV08-00294-AG-RNB; CV07-01395-DOC-MLG (Coleman, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley, identifying The GEO Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Filing 20 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File INITIAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration S. Coleman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Filing 19 JOINDER filed by Defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 . (Coleman, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan E Coleman counsel for Defendants James Black, R. Smith, The GEO Group Inc., George C. Zoley. Adding Susan E. Coleman as attorney as counsel of record for The Geo Group, Inc. (Also sued herein as Adelanto Detention Facility), George C. Zoley, James Black, R. Smith for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants The Geo Group, Inc., George C. Zoley, James Black, R. Smith. (Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party James Black(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party R. Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party The GEO Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party George C. Zoley(pty:dft))(Coleman, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by DEFENDANTS Hector Almaraz. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LARRY ROTHMAN)(Rothman, Larry)
March 2, 2015 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Sam Menlo, (Attorney Larry Rothman added to party Sam Menlo(pty:dft))(Rothman, Larry)
February 26, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Hector Almaraz, (Attorney Larry Rothman added to party Hector Almaraz(pty:dft))(Rothman, Larry)
February 25, 2015 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Federal Defendants Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh, served on 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court Part 1, #2 Notice to State Court Part 2, #3 Notice to State Court Part 3, #4 Proof of Service)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 24, 2015 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi, City of Costa Mesa, Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin, (Touchstone, James)
February 24, 2015 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi, City of Costa Mesa, Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin. (Touchstone, James)
February 24, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi, City of Costa Mesa, Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re City of Costa Mesa, Fred Sequin and Tom Gazsi's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Attorney James R Touchstone added to party Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi(pty:dft), Attorney James R Touchstone added to party City of Costa Mesa(pty:dft), Attorney James R Touchstone added to party Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin(pty:dft))(Touchstone, James)
February 24, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant City of Santa Ana. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Attorney Laura A Rossini added to party City of Santa Ana(pty:dft))(Rossini, Laura)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter, by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
February 17, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV07-01395 DOC (MLGx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV15-00219 DOC (RNBx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dro)
February 10, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo)
February 10, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (nbo)
February 9, 2015 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed in Orange County Superior Court on 1/15/15 by Plaintiffs Annette Martini, Anthony Martini. Attached as Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal. (nbo)
February 9, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Federal Defendants Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Diana Suzanne Corbett, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh. Related Case(s): CV 09-0096 AG (ANx), CV 08-00294 AG (RNBx), and CV 07-01395 DOC (MLGx) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 9, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by Federal Defendants Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Diana Suzanne Corbett, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order Correcting Caption, #3 Proof of Service)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 9, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ingrid Heather Abrash, Jason Aguilar, Jose Barr, Diana Suzanne Corbett, Briana Camille Corso, John Finnegan, Edward R. Grant, Barbara Ann Hale, Megan Berry Herndon, Mark Joven, Andrew Kishlock, Scott D. Laurent, Wesley Lee, John Morton, Hugh G. Mullane, Gary D. Mulphrus, Lorraine J. Munoz, Brian M. O'Leary, Rose Collantes Peters, Andre Quinones, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Rodin Rooyani, Deborah H. Workeneh. (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 9, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2014-00748472-CU-PT-CJC No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Federal Defendants Megan Berry Herndon, Wesley Lee, Brian M. O'Leary, Briana Camille Corso, Edward R. Grant, Jason Aguilar, Andrew Kishlock, John Finnegan, Scott D. Laurent, Riccardo Richiez, Timothy S. Robins, Andre Quinones, Rodin Rooyani, Gary D. Mulphrus, John Morton, Rose Collantes Peters, Mark Joven, Deborah H. Workeneh, Ingrid Heather Abrash, Hugh G. Mullane, Jose Barr, Barbara Ann Hale, Lorraine J. Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Ingrid Heather Abrash(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Jason Aguilar(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Jose Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Briana Camille Corso(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party John Finnegan(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Edward R. Grant(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Barbara Ann Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Megan Berry Herndon(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Mark Joven(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Andrew Kishlock(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Scott D. Laurent(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Wesley Lee(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party John Morton(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Hugh G. Mullane(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Gary D. Mulphrus(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Lorraine J. Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Brian M. O'Leary(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Rose Collantes Peters(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Andre Quinones(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Riccardo Richiez(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Timothy S. Robins(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Rodin Rooyani(pty:dft), Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Deborah H. Workeneh(pty:dft))(Cameron-Banks, Indira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Martini et al v. Rodin Rooyani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodin Rooyani
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George C. Zoley
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kishlock
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Smith
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Black
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of San Bernardino County John McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Collantes Peters
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ann Hale
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Ramiz, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Ana Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Joven
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Ramiz, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh G. Mullane
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Ana
Represented By: Laura A Rossini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Suzanne Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Ana City Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine J. Munoz
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Finnegan
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Lee
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Aguilar
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. O'Leary
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GEO Group Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Security Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Berry Herndon
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Quality Management Inc.
Represented By: Kevin H Mello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Quinones
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Robins
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Adelanto
Represented By: Patrick T Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Barr
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Menlo
Represented By: Larry Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Laurent
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam B. Ersan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah H. Workeneh
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Heather Abrash
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe's and John Doe's From 1-250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Costa Mesa
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Mulphrus
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police of Costa Mesa Police Department Tom Gazsi
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costa Mesa Country Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Verde Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Almaraz
Represented By: Kevin H Mello
Represented By: Larry Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costa Mesa Motor Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelanto Detention Facility
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Grant
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morton
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Sheriff's of San Bernardino - Rod Hoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riccardo Richiez
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Camille Corso
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Air Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Fire Chief of Costa Mesa Fire Department Fred Seguin
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costa Mesa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?