Townsend Farms Inc. v. Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., et al
Plaintiff: Townsend Farms Inc., Purely Pomegranate, Inc. and Valley Forge Insurance Company
Defendant: Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., a Turkish corporation doing business in California doing business as Goknur Foodstuffs Import Export Trading and Production Co., Fallon Trading Co., Inc., United Juice Corp, Does 1 through 100, and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Special Master: The Honorable Rosalyn Chapman (Ret.)
Counter Defendant: Fallon Trading Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00837
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Gaar, William)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #323 MOTION For Mandatory And Permissive Withdrawal. Attorney Marc S Williams; Reuven L Cohen and Kathleen M Erskine terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Marc S. Williams, Reuven L. Cohen, and Kathleen M. Erskine to Withdraw as Attorney #323 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp, Counter Claimants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Williams, Marc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Notice of Electronic Filing re Response in Opposition to Motion #330 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,, #329 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,,, 328 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #327 e-mailed to Christopher Van Gundy at vangundy@khlaw.com bounced due to No such email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Marc S. Williams, Reuven L. Cohen, and Kathleen M. Erskine to Withdraw as Attorney #323 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Gaar, William)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles James Snyder counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp, Counter Claimants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Charles J. Snyder is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants. (Attorney Charles James Snyder added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:cc), Attorney Charles James Snyder added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Charles James Snyder added to party United Juice Corp(pty:cc))(Snyder, Charles)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #324 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #325 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Marc S. Williams, Reuven L. Cohen, and Kathleen M. Erskine to Withdraw as Attorney #323 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #326 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #327 e-mailed to Gonzalo Martinez, Jr at gonzalo.martinez@squirepb.com bounced due to Unknown address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naomi K Hills counsel for Counter Claimant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,. Naomi K. Hills is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Naomi Hills. (Hills, Naomi)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Rohling Kelly counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Filed by Defendants previously represented parties Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S. and United Juice Corp.. (Kelly, Meghan)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anya Jennifer Goldstein counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp, Counter Claimants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Anya Jennifer Goldstein is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S. & & United Juice Corp.. (Goldstein, Anya)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Wayne Oxley counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Filed by Defendants previously represented parties Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S. and United Juice Corp.. (Oxley, William)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Marc S. Williams, Reuven L. Cohen, and Kathleen M. Erskine to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant, Counterclaimant, and Judgment Debtor Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Marc S. Williams, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service) (Williams, Marc)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby AMENDS its prior Judgment (Dkt. #280 ) to reflect the Ninth Circuits ruling as follows: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #303 , and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #304 , CCA # 18-55067 and 18-55068. The judgment of this Court, entered November 27, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #320 The decision of the district court is affirmed. AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED. Each party shall bear its own costs. ] (mat)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #303 #304 filed by Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S. United Juice Corp. CCA # 18-55067. The decision of the district court is affirmed. AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED. (twdb)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #303 filed by Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., United Juice Corp, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #305 filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company, Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. CCA # 18-55067 and 18-55072. The parties' stipulated motion to voluntarily dismiss appeals is granted. Appeal no. 18-55067 is dismissed as to Appellees/Cross-Appellants Purely Pomegranate, Inc. ("PPI") and Valley Forge Insurance Company ("VFI'') only. Appeal no. 18-55072 is dismissed in its entirety. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court as to the named parties. Appeal no. 18-55067 continues as to Appellee Townsend Farms, Inc. (mat)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company. Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment by Defendants as to Purely Pomegranate, Inc. and Valley Forge Insurance Co. (Godwin, G)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/3/17 re Transcript #316 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4-3-17. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2018. (ha)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transcript (CV) #313 . The transcript itself is fine. The typo is in the description on the docket entry. The correct date is April 3, 2017. (lmh)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/3/2018 Vol. I re Transcript #313 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 **SEE CLERICAL ERROR DKT. NO. 315** TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/3/2018 Vol. I. ****Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.**** Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (Gale, Debbie) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lmh).
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendants-Appellants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp re #303 (Goldstein, Anya)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-55067, 18-55068, 18-55072, as to Defendants and Appellants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rebecca Lessler at rlessler@cohen-williams.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Goldstein, Anya)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-55067, 18-55068, 18-55072, as to Defendants and Appellants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rebecca Lessler at rlessler@cohen-williams.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Goldstein, Anya)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-55067, 18-55068, 18-55072, as to Defendants and Appellants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Rebecca Lessler at rlessler@cohen-williams.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Goldstein, Anya)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Cross Appeal Docket No. 18-55072 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #305 as to Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. (shb)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Cross Appeal Docket No. 18-55068 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #304 as to Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. (shb)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55067 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #303 as to Counterclaimant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,. (shb)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company. Appeal of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #302 , Judgment, #280 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21112371.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Appeal)(Godwin, G)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #302 , Judgment, #280 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21110358.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant-Counterclaimant-Appellant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Appeal of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #302 , Order on Motion to Dismiss, #119 , Judgment, #280 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21106453.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (orders and judgment appealed from), #2 Exhibit B (representation statement))(Williams, Marc)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR NEW TRIAL ON DAMAGES #288 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW #289 by Judge David O. Carter. (es)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPPOSITION to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Judgement filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 by Judge David O. Carter. (Briefing due by 12/18/2017). (dgo)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Judgment, #280 . #288 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 10/2/2017 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 REPLY in support of Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Goldstein, Anya)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Judgment, #280 . #288 filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment or, Alternatively, for New Trial on Damages, #2 Declaration of William E. Gaar in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment or, Alternatively, for New Trial on Damages)(Godwin, G)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 DECLARATION of Christopher Van Gundy in opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 2)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #289 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE (CORRECTED) OF FILING OF TRIAL EXHIBIT 499 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 499 Vol. 1, #2 Exhibit 499 Vol. 2, #3 Exhibit 499 Vol. 3, #4 Exhibit 499 Vol. 4, #5 Exhibit 499 Vol. 5, #6 Exhibit 499 Vol. 6, #7 Exhibit 499 Vol. 7, #8 Exhibit 499 Vol. 8, #9 Exhibit 499 Vol. 9, #10 Exhibit 499 Vol. 10, #11 Exhibit 499 Vol. 11, #12 Exhibit 499 Vol. 12, #13 Exhibit 499 Vol. 13, #14 Exhibit 499 Vol. 14, #15 Exhibit 499 Vol. 15, #16 Exhibit 499 Vol. 16, #17 Exhibit 499 Vol. 17, #18 Exhibit 499 Vol. 18, #19 Exhibit 499 Vol. 19, #20 Exhibit 499 Vol. 20, #21 Exhibit 499 Vol. 21, #22 Exhibit 499 Vol. 22)(Goldstein, Anya)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp of Trial Exhibit 499. (Goldstein, Anya)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Judgment, #280 . #288 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits A-H)(Goldstein, Anya)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $54875.24 in favor of Plaintiff, Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Co. and Townsend Farms, Inc. and against Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S. and United Juice Corp. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs 283], and Corrected APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs #285 (kr)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams (with Exhibits A-F), #2 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Anya)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Judgment, #280 . filed by plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Declaration of G. David Godwin, #3 Proposed Order) (Godwin, G)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STATEMENT JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company to Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #284 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Objections to Application to Clerk to Tax Costs (Godwin, G)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Corrected APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(a Turkish corporation doing business in California) filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc., Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #3 Exhibit 3 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #4 Exhibit 4 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #5 Exhibit 5 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #6 Exhibit 6 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #7 Exhibit 7 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #8 Exhibit 8 to Corrected Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs) (Attorney G David Godwin added to party Valley Forge Insurance Company(pty:pla)) (Godwin, G)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OBJECTION in opposition re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(a Turkish corporation doing business in California), United Juice Corp #283 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(a Turkish corporation doing business in California), United Juice Corp filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 of Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit 3 of Bill of Costs, #4 Exhibit 4 of Bill of Costs, #5 Exhibit 5 of Bill of Costs, #6 Exhibit 6 of Bill of Costs, #7 Exhibit 7 of Bill of Costs, #8 Exhibit 8 of Bill of Costs) (Godwin, G)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #281 Non-Resident Attorney Naomi K. Hills APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of (see document for details), designating Marc Williams as local counsel. (dro)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Naomi K. Hills to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20 285885) filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Marc)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT, finding no just reason for delay, this Judgment is certified as final pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). See document for further information. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lwag)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge David O. Carter: See document for further information. (lwag)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 04/04/2017, Vol II, 10:49 a.m. and Vol IV, 3:39 p.m.; 04/05/2017, Vol III, 11:06 a.m. and Vol V, 4:33 p.m.; 04/06/2017, Vol III, 1:17 p.m.; 04/07/2017, Vol II, 1:16 p.m.; 04/11/2017, Vol II, 10:18 a.m. and Vol IV, 2:29 p.m.; 04/12/2017, Vol II, 12:27 a.m. and 04/13/2017, Vol III, 11:26 a.m. re Transcript #277 , #273 , #275 , #274 , #269 , #276 , #271 , #270 , #272 , #268 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Parker, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/13/2017, Vol III, 11:26 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/12/2017, Vol II, 12:27 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/11/2017, Vol IV, 2:29 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/11/2017, Vol II, 10:18 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/07/2017, Vol II, 1:16 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/06/2017, Vol III, 1:17 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/05/2017, Vol V, 4:33 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/05/2017, Vol III, 11:06 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/04/2017, Vol. IV, 3:39 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/04/2017, Vol II, 10:49 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Parker, Deborah)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings March 6, 2017 and April 4-14, 2017 re Transcript #258 , #257 , #265 , #261 , #255 , #260 , #259 , #262 , #263 , #266 , #264 , #256 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 14, 2017 Jury Trial Day 8, Verdict. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 13, 2017 Jury Trial Day 7, Vol. II. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 12, 2017 Jury Trial Day 6, Vol. I. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 11, 2017 Jury Trial Day 5, Vol. III. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 11, 2017 Jury Trial Day 5, Vol. I. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 10, 2017 Status Conference.Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 7, 2017 Jury Trial Day 4, Vol. I. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 6, 2017, Day 3, Vol. II. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 5, 2017, Jury Trial Day 2, Vol. IV. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 5, 2017, Jury Trial Day 2, Vol. II. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 4, 2017 Jury Trial Day 1, Vol. III. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on April 4, 2017 Jury Trial Day 1 Vol. I. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on March 6, 2017 PT Motions. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc. to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #247 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Entry of [Proposed] Judgment (Godwin, G)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Judgment re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #243 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Williams, Marc)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #243 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Williams, Marc)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 DECLARATION of Anya J. Goldstein re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #249 in Opposition filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Williams, Marc)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 BRIEF filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. in Opposition regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #247 . (Williams, Marc)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #243 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Godwin, G)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. in Support of Entry of [Proposed] Judgment regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #243 . (Godwin, G)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #243 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment, #2 Exhibit 628 to Proposed Judgment, #3 Memorandum in Support of Request for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, #4 Declaration of Tania Rice in Support of Prejudgment Interest Request, #5 Exhibit A to Rice Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Rice Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Rice Declaration, #8 Declaration of Christopher Van Gundy in Support of Townsend Farm's Request for Prejudgment Interest, #9 Exhibit 1 to Van Gundy Declaration, #10 Exhibit 2 to Van Gundy Declaration, #11 Exhibit 3 to Van Gundy Declaration, #12 Exhibit 4 to Van Gundy Declaration, #13 Exhibit 5 to Van Gundy Declaration, #14 Exhibit 6 to Van Gundy Declaration, #15 Exhibit 7 to Van Gundy Declaration)(Godwin, G)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/13/17, 8:27 a.m. re Transcript #244 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/13/17, 8:27 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2017. (ls)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Calling for Briefing by Judge David O. Carter. On April 14, 2017, a jury returned a verdict for Plaintiffs in this action. Redacted Jury Verdict Form (Dkt. #235 ) at 2-6. There are claims still outstanding in this action that the parties agree must be decided by the Court. The Plaintiffs have also stated they intend to ask the Court to "correct" the jury's damages determination. Letter Requesting Permission to Submit Proposed Judgment, and Post-Trial Issues (Dkt. #242 ) at 1. Accordingly, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: (see document for details). (dro)
April 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Letter Requesting Permission to Submit Proposed Judgment, and Post-Trial Issues (Godwin, G)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 UNREDACTED JURY VERDICT FORM, RE REDACTED JURY VERDICT FORM #235 (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 UNREDACTED JURY NOTES, RE REDACTED JURY NOTES #234 (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 EXHIBITS ADMITTED AT TRIAL. (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 WITNESS LIST. (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial/After Hearing; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge David O. Carter. (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REDACTED JURY VERDICT FORM (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REDACTED JURY NOTES filed. (mt)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 8th Day held and completed before Judge David O. Carter: Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: in favor of plaintiff. Jury polled. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Samantha Garza at sgarza@cohen-williams.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Goldstein, Anya)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held before Judge David O. Carter.Motion for Judgment by Defendant is denied. : Jury Trial continued to 4/14/2017 08:00 AM for further deliberations. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (dro)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6th Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Defendant(s) rest. Motion for Judgment by Defendant is submitted. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Jury Trial continued to 4/13/2017 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (mt)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/6/2017; 4:56 p.m re Transcript #230 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/6/2017; 4:56 p.m. Trial - Day 3 Vol. IV Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017. (at)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/6/2017 re Transcript #228 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/6/2017, Trial - Day 3 Vol I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017. (at)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 4/12/2017 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Recorder: CourtSmart, Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (mt)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiffs Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Samantha Garza at sgarza@cohen-williams.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Goldstein, Anya)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/5/2017; 7:21 a.m. re Transcript #223 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/5/2017; 7:21 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017. (at)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 4/11/2017 at 8:00 AM for further trial. Court and counsel confer regarding exhibits. Counsel to return on 4/10/2017 at 10:00 AM to discuss jury instructions. Court Reporter: CourtSmart, Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (es)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to April 7, 2017 at 8:30 AM for further trial. Turkish Interpreter Kemal Erkol present and assisted witness Osman Aslanali. Joanne S. Osinoff, AUSA present and addresses court re: Touhy issue. Court and counsel confer regarding exhibits. Court Reporter: CourtSmart, Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (dv)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Samantha Garza at sgarza@cohen-williams.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Goldstein, Anya)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 4/6/2017 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Turkish Interpreter Kemal Erkol sworn and assisted witnesses Selin Kilic and Osman Aslanali. Court Reporter: CourtSmart, Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (mt)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2017 at 7:00 AM for further trial. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Deborah Parker. (es)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Trial to begin 4/4/17 @ 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale CourtSmart Deborah Parker. (mt)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Stipulation re Certain Amounts Sought as Damages filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc. (Godwin, G)
April 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OBJECTIONS to Jury Instructions (Proposed) #202 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Goldstein, Anya)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Stipulation to Amend Order Compelling Testimony of Herminio Francisco #210 . The matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs Townsend Farms, Inc., Purely Pomegranate, Inc., and Valley Forge Insurance Co. and Defendants Gknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticarer ve Sanayi A.S and United Juice Corp.'s Stipulation to amend the Court's March 28, 2017 Order [Dkt. No. 200] such that Mr. Herminio Francisco is ordered to appear to testify at trial on April 7, 2017, at 9:00 a.m., rather than on April 4, 2017. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Joint Exhibit List Second Supplemental Joint Trial Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Godwin, G)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION to Amend Order on Motion to Enforce, #200 filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Amend Order Compelling Testimony of Herminio Francisco)(Godwin, G)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preclusion of Further Untimely and Improperly-Identified Witnesses from Testifying at Trial (Jeff Tucker and Louis-Philippe Simard) #186 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams (Supp.), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Williams, Marc)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp.. (Williams, Marc)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Godwin, G)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Godwin, G)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Godwin, G)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 628)(Godwin, G)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc... (Van Gundy, Christopher)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STATEMENT Joint Statement of Case filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc. (Godwin, G)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: GRANTING #180 Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion, and ORDERS that Herminio Francisco comply with the subpoena for trial testimony issued to him and appear at trial on April 4, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. (mba)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: GRANTING #179 Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion, and ORDERS that Dr. Erin Epson comply with the subpoena for trial testimony issued to her and appear at trial on April 7, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. (mba)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT re #176 . (mba)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial #180 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial #179 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Preclude Untimely and Improperly-Identified Government Witnesses from Testifying at Trial #176 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial #180 filed by Movant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:bkmov))(Whittlesey, Brent)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Opposition Opposition to Defendants' Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preclusion of Further Untimely and Improperly-Identified Witnesses from Testifying at Trial (Jeff Tucker and Louis-Philippe Simard) #186 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Arthur Garrett, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/6/2017 re Transcript #191 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/6/2017 Hearing. ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE ---WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com/ telephone 714-558-8141/ EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com --- before the deadlinefor Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER.ADDITIONAL FORMATS of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available forpurchase at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 4/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2017. (Gale, Debbie)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #187 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing. Based upon the papers and any argument and evidence presented to the Court inconnection with the Application, the Court hereby GRANTS the Application, andORDERS that the time on Defendants' Motion to Preclude Further Untimely and Improperly-Identified Witnesses from Testifying at Trial (Jeff Tucker and Louis-Philippe Simard) (Dkt. #186 ) (the Motion) be shortened as follows: Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion, if any, must be filed by March 27, 2017. Defendants' Reply in support of the Motion, if any, must be filed by March 29, 2017. The matter shall be taken under submission upon receipt of the briefing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 4/3/2017 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Opposition Opposition to Defendants' Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Preclude Untimely and Improperly-Identified Government Witnesses from Testifying at Trial #176 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Preclude Untimely and Improperly-Identified Government Witnesses from Testifying at Trial #176 to the earliest hearing time convenient t #177 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Declaration D. Godwin's Support of Plaintiff's Opposition)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preclusion of Further Untimely and Improperly-Identified Witnesses from Testifying at Trial (Jeff Tucker and Louis-Philippe Simard) #186 to the earliest hearing time convenient to the Court filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Marc)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preclusion of Further Untimely and Improperly-Identified Witnesses from Testifying at Trial (Jeff Tucker and Louis-Philippe Simard) filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Marc S. Williams added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft)) (Williams, Marc)
March 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Anya Jennifer Goldstein counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Changing firm name to Cohen Williams Williams LLP. Changing e-mail to agoldstein@cohen-williams.com. Filed by Defendants Goknur and United Juice Corp. (Goldstein, Anya)
March 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Marc S. Williams counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Changing firm name to Cohen Williams Williams LLP. Changing e-mail to mwilliams@cohen-williams.com. Filed by Defendants Goknur and United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 3/22/2017 @ 2:00 PM has been CANCELLED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial #180 served on 3/16/2017. (Godwin, G)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 3/22/2017 @ 2:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Herminio Francisco to Appear as a Witness at Trial) (Godwin, G)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Dr. Erin Epson to Appear as a Witness at Trial) (Godwin, G)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter denying #177 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing. (see document for details). (dro)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Preclude Untimely and Improperly-Identified Government Witnesses from Testifying at Trial #176 to the earliest hearing time convenient to the Court filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Anya)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Preclude Untimely and Improperly-Identified Government Witnesses from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Williams, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #3 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Anya)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing re Motions in Limine #145 - #147 ; #149 - #153 ; #155 held before Judge David O. Carter: Tentative rulings given on the motions in limine. Court to issue a final order. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Goltz; Plaintiff Attorney: Arthur S. Garrett, William E. Gaar, Christophe Van Gundy, G. David Goodwin; Defendant Attorney: Marc S. Williams, Anya Goldstein, Gonzala Martinez, Wallace Smith, Charles Snyder. Time in Court: 1:13. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles James Snyder counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Adding Charles J. Snyder as counsel of record for Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., et al and United Juice Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United Juice Corp. and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi. (Attorney Charles James Snyder added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Charles James Snyder added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Snyder, Charles)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodging [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony By Dr. Lee-Ann Jaykus #153 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4)(Goldstein, Anya)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodging [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial #152 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3)(Goldstein, Anya)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodging [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence of Customer Complaints and Regulatory Actions Involving Other Goknur Products #151 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2)(Goldstein, Anya)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodging [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to Government Reports #150 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Second MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Trial Exhibit 347 #146 (as amended by #157 ) filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Goldstein, Anya)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Sam's Club and NYSDOH Evidence #145 (as amended by #158 ) filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1, #2 Exhibit - Exhibits A-F in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude The Testimony of Arthur J. Miller or Certain Portions Thereof #147 (as amended by #159 ) filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4, #2 Exhibit A in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer #149 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3)(Attorney Anya Jennifer Goldstein added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Anya)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Opposition to Goknurs Motion in Limine No. 2 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence of Customer Complaints and Regulatory Actions Involving Other Goknur Products #151 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to Government Reports #150 filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Relating to Government Reports)(Godwin, G)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Opposition to Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Portions of Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony By Dr. Lee-Ann Jaykus #153 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial #152 filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial)(Godwin, G)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Sam's Club and NYSDOH Evidence, Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Trial Exhibit 347 and Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion in Limine No. 4 To Exclude The Testimony of Dr. Arthur J. Miller or Certain Portion's Thereof. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 First NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. of Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Amendment to Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude The Testimony of Arthur J. Miller or Certain Portions Thereof #147 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Amendment to First MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Sam's Club and NYSDOH Evidence #155 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Amendment to Second MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Trial Exhibit 347 #146 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr Melvin Kramer re MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer #149 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Godwin, G)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 [AMENDED filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Sam's Club and NYSDOH Evidence filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Van Gundy, Christopher) Modified on 3/28/2017 (dgo).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gonzalo Martinez, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc. (Attorney Gonzalo Martinez, Jr added to party Purely Pomegranate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Martinez, Gonzalo)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony By Dr. Lee-Ann Jaykus filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-B in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Preclude Erin Epson as a Witness at Trial filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence of Customer Complaints and Regulatory Actions Involving Other Goknur Products filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Goldstein, Anya)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to Government Reports filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1)(Goldstein, Anya)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer, #2 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of G. David Godwin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony by Dr. Melvin Kramer)(Godwin, G)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. (Godwin, G)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude The Testimony of Arthur J. Miller or Certain Portions Thereof filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Trial Exhibit 347 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Sam's Club and NYSDOH Evidence filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Joint Deposition Designations and Objections (Godwin, G)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Joint Exhibit List Supplemental Joint Trial Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Godwin, G)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Re Use of Copies of Deposition Transcripts in Lieu of Originals by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation for Order, #141 . (see document for details). (dro)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION for Order re Use of Copies of Deposition Transcripts in Lieu of Originals filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Use of Copies of Deposition Transcripts in Lieu of Originals, #2 Letter To The Honorable David O. Carter re Use of Copies of Deposition Transcripts in Lieu of Originals)(Godwin, G)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Re Amended Stipulation to Extend February 23 and 27, 2017 Deadlines for Certain Pretrial Conference Deadlines #139 (mt)
February 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Amended STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File (1) Stipulated Set of Facts; (2) [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order; and (3) Motions in Limine filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Final Pretrial Conference Order, Stipulated Set of Facts and Motions in Limine filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Trial to proceed on 4/4/2017 @ 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Goltz; Plaintiff Attorney: Arthur S. Garrett, III, Wallace E. Smith, William E. Gaar, Christopher Van Gundy, G. David Goodwin; Defendant Attorney: Mark Williams, Anya Goldstein. Time in Court: :19. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SPECIAL MASTER'S LAST BIMONTHLY DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT filed by Special Master Rosalyn Chapman. (ts)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Williams, Marc)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Witness List filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp.. (Williams, Marc)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Godwin, G)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Joint Exhibit List (Joint Trial Exhibit List) filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc., Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,.. (Godwin, G)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc... (Godwin, G)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 @ 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPORT filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Jury Trial previously scheduled for 4/11/2017 8:30 AM has been RESCHEDULED. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2017 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wallace E Smith counsel for Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. Adding Wallace E. Smith as counsel of record for Purely Pomegranate, Inc. and Valley Forge Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc. and Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attorney Wallace E Smith added to party Purely Pomegranate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Smith, Wallace)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney G David Godwin counsel for Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. Robert A. Binion is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., and Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Godwin, G)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify Schedule to take Sam's Club Deposition after Discovery cut-off Date (mt)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Deadline #123 . The deadline to complete expert witness depositions is continued from January 13, 2017 to February 4, 2017. (ig)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION to Extend Expert Discovery Cut-Off Date to February 4, 2017. (dgo)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S (INFORMAL) MOTION TO COMPEL THE TAKING OF DEPOSITIONS IN LOS ANGELES by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SPECIAL MASTER'S THIRD BIMONTHLY DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT filed by Special Master Rosalyn Chapman. (dro)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Certain Discovery Deadlines by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #113 MOTION to Dismiss. For the reasons above, the Court GRANTS Counterdefendant's Motion. Because the Court is satisfied that the deficiencies in the Counterclaim cannot be remedied on amendment, Counterclaimant's Counterclaim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (see document for details). (dro)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Counterclaim of Goknur #112 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Goknur #113 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 11/21/2016 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY Support of Motion Request For Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 GOKNURS MEMORANDUM IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO TOWNSEND FARMS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Goknur #113 DECLARATION OF MARC S. WILLIAMS filed by Counter Claimant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Marc)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Goknur #113 DECLARATION OF MARC S. WILLIAMS filed by Counter Claimant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Marc)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Goknur filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 to RJN, #3 Exhibit Exh 2 to RJN, #4 Exhibit Exh 3 to RJN, #5 Exhibit Exh 4 to RJN, #6 Exhibit Exh 5 to RJN, #7 Exhibit Exh 6 to RJN, #8 Exhibit Exh 7 to RJN, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Van Gundy, Christopher)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Counterclaim of Goknur filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 to RJN, #3 Exhibit Exh 2 to RJN, #4 Exhibit Exh 3 to RJN, #5 Exhibit Exh 4 to RJN, #6 Exhibit Exh 5 to RJN, #7 Exhibit Exh 6 to RJN, #8 Exhibit Exh 7 to RJN, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Van Gundy, Christopher)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant United Juice Corp pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) and 41c(1) as to Fallon Trading Company. (Williams, Marc)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SPECIAL MASTER'S SECOND BIMONTHLY DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT filed by Special Master Rosalyn Chapman. (lwag)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #107 , COUNTERCLAIM against Fallon Trading Company filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant United Juice Corp.(Williams, Marc)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #107 , COUNTERCLAIM against Townsend Farms Inc. filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,.(Williams, Marc)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp amending Consolidated Complaint, #72 , filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.(Van Gundy, Christopher)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Change of address by Robert Alfred Binion attorney for Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 275 Battery Street, Suite 2600, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attorney Robert Alfred Binion added to party Townsend Farms Inc.(pty:pla))(Binion, Robert)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reuven L Cohen counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Adding Reuven L. Cohen as counsel of record for Defendants United Juice Corp. and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Juice Corp. and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi. (Attorney Reuven L Cohen added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Reuven L Cohen added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Cohen, Reuven)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc S. Williams counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Adding Marc S. Williams as counsel of record for Defendants United Juice Corp. and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Juice Corp. and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi. (Attorney Marc S. Williams added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Marc S. Williams added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Williams, Marc)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of William W Oxley re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #102 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oxley, William)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #98 by Judge David O. Carter: Thus, the Court ORDERS as follows: The Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED on condition that, no later than September 6, 2016, moving counsel file with the Court and serve upon its clients a declaration: Setting forth the client's current address and telephone number, verified as accurate by the withdrawing attorney. See document for further information. (lwag)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulation Extending Expert Disclosures and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Dates #97 (mt)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Dechert LLP's APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review #99 (mt)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Meghan)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of William W Oxley and Meghan Rohling Kelly to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Meghan)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/13/2017 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 1)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting in part #81 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, if desired, on or before September 6, 2016. (see document for details). (dro)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Special Master's First Bimonthly Discovery STATUS REPORT. (lwag)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint #81 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/15/2016 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint #81 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Kelly, Meghan)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/9/2016 re Transcript #93 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/9/2016. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2016. (at)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint #81 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration R. Binion Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint re Stipulation #87 . Having considered the Parties' Stipulation submitted with this Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Consolidated Complaint to add certain claims in the form reflected in the Parties' Stipulation. The Court shall set a date certain for filing the First Amended Consolidated Complaint after resolution of Defendants' pending motion to dismiss. (mba)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Theresa Miletich at theresa.miletich@dechert.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Kelly, Meghan)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Carmen Tapia at carmen.tapia@squirepb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Binion, Robert)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant United Juice Corp, identifying Osman Aslanali; Turkey Juice; United Juice Corp.; Townsend Farms, Inc.; Purely Pomegranate, Inc.; Valley Forge Insurance Company; Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.. (Kelly, Meghan)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, identifying Osman Aslanali; Turkey Juice; United Juice Corp.; Townsend Farms, Inc.; Purely Pomegranate, Inc.; Valley Forge Insurance Company; Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.. (Kelly, Meghan)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint #81 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint #81 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 7/15/2016 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2016 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Meghan Rohling Kelly added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Rohling Kelly added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft)) (Kelly, Meghan)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Extending Time to Amend the Consolidated Complaint re Stipulation #77 . For good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs' time to amend the Consolidated Complaint be extended from July 8, 2016 to July 22, 2016. (mba)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #76 REQUEST to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ankur Tarneja; Cary L Wood; Heidi S Inman and Lisa Lin Ricksecker terminated. (mba)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #75 REQUEST to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ankur Tarneja; Heidi S Inman and Lisa Lin Ricksecker terminated. (mba)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REQUEST to Substitute attorney William W Oxley in place of attorney Heidi S Inman filed by defendant United Juice Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney William Wayne Oxley added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft)) (Oxley, William)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REQUEST to Substitute attorney William W Oxley in place of attorney Heidi S Inman filed by defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney William Wayne Oxley added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft)) (Oxley, William)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Extending United Juice Corp. and Goknur's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint re #73 . For good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that United Juice Corp. and Goknur's response to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint be extended from July 1, 2016 to July 15, 2016. (mba)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 7/15/2016 filed by Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attorney Lisa Lin Ricksecker added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft)) (Ricksecker, Lisa)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: #27 Amended Complaint/Petition,, filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Christopher Van Gundy added to party Purely Pomegranate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Van Gundy, Christopher)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Special Master Hon. Rosalyn Chapman: FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS SO ORDERED, as amended at Paragraphs 1.1, 5.2, 6.2, 7.2, 8.1, 8.2, 8.3, 10.3, 13.1, 13.3, and 14.1. See document for further information. (lwag)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #54 Motion to File Amended Consolidated Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Proposed Consolidated Complaint on or before June 10, 2016.(see document for further details) (mba)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 INITIAL REPORT filed by Special Master. (lwag)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Appointing Special Master by Judge David O. Carter granting #67 APPLICATION to Appoint Special Master. 1. Pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby appoints The Honorable Rosalyn Chapman (Ret.), JAMS, 555 W. 5th Street, 32nd Floor, Los Angeles, CA, 90013, as Special Master in this action for the following purposes: (see document for details). (dro)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 First APPLICATION to Appoint Special Master Judge Rosalyn Chapman filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Van Gundy counsel for Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. Kevin A. Dorse will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Kevin A. Dorse is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms, Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Heidi S Inman counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Morgan A. Gower is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Juice Corp and Goknur. (Inman, Heidi)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Heidi S Inman counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Nicole Ramirez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Juice Corp and Goknur. (Inman, Heidi)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 12/19/2016. Motions due by 2/13/2017 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2017 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (nbo)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets the following case management dates: Discovery cut-off 12/19/2016. Motion cut-off by 2/13/2017 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (nbo)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order Requiring Filing of Proposed Order re: Special Master. (mt)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Re: MOTION to File Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Plaintiff #54 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 05/16/2016 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amended Consolidated Complaint #54 filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Godwin, G)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ankur Tarneja counsel for Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. Adding Ankur Tarneja as counsel of record for United Juice Corp., a New Jersey corporation and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi dba Goknur Foodstuffs Import Export Trading and Production Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United Juice Corp., a New Jersey corporation and Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi dba Goknur Foodstuffs Import Export Trading and Production Co.. (Attorney Ankur Tarneja added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft), Attorney Ankur Tarneja added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Tarneja, Ankur)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 5/2/2016 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 5/9/2016 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amended Consolidated Complaint #54 filed by Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp. (Attorney Heidi S Inman added to party Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,(pty:dft))(Inman, Heidi)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT of FRCP 26(f) FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiffs Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., Townsend Farms Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Binion in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint) (Attorney G David Godwin added to party Townsend Farms Inc.(pty:pla)) (Godwin, G)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order Re: Joint 26(f) Report. (mt)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #51 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc., upon Defendant Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., served on 1/29/2016, answer due 2/19/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zahide Haziroglu, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Minutes of Scheduling Conference #49 . The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 5/2/2016 @ 7:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 5/2/2016 @ 8:30 AM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Defendants to file a motion to withdraw as counsel by March 11, 2016 to be scheduled for May 2, 2016 at 7:30 a.m. The Court will issue scheduling dates at that time.Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (lwag)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Law Firm Change Affiliation filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. and Valley Forge Insurance Company (Binion, Robert)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Alfred Binion on behalf of Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc. (Attorney Robert Alfred Binion added to party Purely Pomegranate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Binion, Robert)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney G David Godwin counsel for Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. Adding G. David Godwin as counsel of record for Purely Pomegranate, Inc., and Valley Forge Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc., and Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attorney G David Godwin added to party Purely Pomegranate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Godwin, G)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT of Joint Rule 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Further Extending Time #43 by Judge David O. Carter: THE COURT HAVING CONSIDERED THE PARTIES' Stipulation to Further Extend Time to file a Motion to Strike, hereby orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' deadline to file a motion to strike with respect to the Amended Answers currently on file by Defendants is extended to February 17, 2016. (lwag)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Lisa Ricksecker on behalf of Defendant United Juice Corp. Filed by Defendant United Juice Corp (Attorney Lisa Lin Ricksecker added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Ricksecker, Lisa)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS ORDERED THAT Defendant PPI's deadline to file a motion to strike with respect to Goknur's Amended Answer is extended to February 3, 2016 re Stipulation #40 . (mba)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc..(Van Gundy, Christopher)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial and Trial Purposes by Judge David O. Carter. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS as follows: (1) All remaining claims in the two cases shall be tried in one trial; (2) A new consolidated complaint shall be filed in the low-number case, Townsend Farms, 15-0837; and (3) Going forward, all documents in both cases shall be filed only under the low-number case, Townsend Farms, 15-0837. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dro).
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. correcting Status Report #37 erroneously filed in the incorrect matter (Binion, Robert)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS REPORT and Joint Request for Consolidation filed by Plaintiffs Townsend Farms Inc., Purely Pomegranate, Inc.. (Binion, Robert)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Status Report and Request for Consolidation filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #27 filed by Defendant United Juice Corp. (Gower, Morgan)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Heidi S. Inman on behalf of Defendant United Juice Corp. Filed by Defendant United Juice Corp (Attorney Heidi S Inman added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Inman, Heidi)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc., General Minutes served on 12/17/2015. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc., upon Defendant United Juice Corp served on 12/3/2015, answer due 12/24/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Jensen, Attorney at Lewis Brisboi, Attorneys for United Juice, Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on United Juice, Corp)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #27 JURY DEMAND. UNITED JUICE CORP.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by defendant United Juice Corp.(Attorney Nicole Ramirez added to party United Juice Corp(pty:dft))(Ramirez, Nicole)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #27 as to defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., United Juice Corp. (twdb)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #27 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,, United Juice Corp amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Fallon Trading Co., Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Scheduling held before Judge David O. Carter: SA CV 15-0620-DOC (JCGx) and SA CV 15-0663-DOC (JCGx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 14-1176-DOC (JCGx). The plaintiffs are directed to file an amended consolidated complaint on or before August 17, 2015 and all future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 14-1176-DOC (JCGx). The scheduling order already entered in SA CV 14-1176-DOC (JCGx) shall remain in place. The Court will not consolidate SA CV 15-0837-DOC (JCGx) and SA CV 15-0840-DOC (JCGx) at this time in order to allow the plaintiffs in those cases time to serve process on the defendants, although the parties are forewarned that the Court's intent is to consolidate the two cases for pretrial and trial purposes. Plaintiffs in those cases shall file proof of service within 30 days of service having been completed. The Court also will not consolidate Costco's and Townsend Farms's third-party claims in SA CV 13-1292-DOC (JCGx) and SA CV 14-1176-DOC (JCGx) with SA CV 15-0837-DOC (JCGx) at this time, based on the parties' representation that those third-party claims will soon be dismissed as a result of an out-of-court settlement. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (mt)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Consolidated (Van Gundy, Christopher)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION for attorney Arthur S. Garrett III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16032353 paid.) #21 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Good Standing Certificate from DC is undated.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge David O. Carter: granting #21 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur S. Garrett, III on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Kevin A. Dorse as local counsel. (lt)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 First APPLICATION for attorney Arthur S. Garrett III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16032353 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Gundy, Christopher)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Minute Orders To Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Consolidated filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter Re: Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Consolidated. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS as follows: Plaintiffs in all cases shall serve this minute order upon any defendants who have not yet appeared. The parties shall file a joint response to this Order to Show Cause on or before July 27, 2015. A status conference to discuss scheduling of all cases is set for August 3, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (see document for details). (dro)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED by Judge David O. Carter. Plaintiffs in all cases shall serve this minute order upon any defendants who have not yet appeared. The parties shall file a joint response to this Order to Show Cause on or before July 27, 2015. A status conference to discuss scheduling of all cases is set for August 3, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. (mba)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge David O. Carter: granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William E. Gaar on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Kevin A. Dorse as local counsel. (lt)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corrected APPLICATION for attorney William E. Gaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van Gundy, Christopher)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION for attorney William E. Gaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15900241 paid.) #12 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by. (twdb)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney William E. Gaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15900241 paid.) #12 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. See LR 83-2.1.3.4. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney William E. Gaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15900241 paid.) #12 . The following error(s) was found: A Certificate of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application.Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Application of Non Resident Attorney is missing. Only Proposed Order is attached.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION for attorney William E. Gaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15900241 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-1292 DOC (JCGx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (twdb)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 27 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Fallon Trading Co., Inc., Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., United Juice Corp. (twdb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (twdb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Each document should have a separate docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): Use correct docket events for the documents. (twdb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc., (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Townsend Farms, Inc. Townsend Farms Inc.. (Van Gundy, Christopher)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15800563 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Townsend Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Notice of Related Cases, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Memorandum Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Christopher Van Gundy added to party Townsend Farms Inc.(pty:pla))(Van Gundy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend Farms Inc. v. Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Townsend Farms Inc.
Represented By: Arthur S Garrett
Represented By: G. David Godwin
Represented By: Kevin Dorse
Represented By: Robert Alfred Binion
Represented By: Wallace E Smith
Represented By: William E Gaar
Represented By: Christopher Van Gundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purely Pomegranate, Inc.
Represented By: G. David Godwin
Represented By: Gonzalo Martinez, Jr
Represented By: Robert Alfred Binion
Represented By: Wallace E Smith
Represented By: Christopher Van Gundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: G. David Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Brent A. Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S., a Turkish corporation doing business in California doing business as Goknur Foodstuffs Import Export Trading and Production Co.
Represented By: Kathleen M Erskine
Represented By: Marc S Williams
Represented By: Reuven L. Cohen
Represented By: Ankur Tarneja
Represented By: Anya Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Charles James Snyder
Represented By: Heidi S Inman
Represented By: Lisa Lin Ricksecker
Represented By: Meghan Rohling Kelly
Represented By: Naomi K Hills
Represented By: William Wayne Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallon Trading Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Juice Corp
Represented By: Cary L Wood
Represented By: Kathleen M Erskine
Represented By: Marc S Williams
Represented By: Reuven L. Cohen
Represented By: Ankur Tarneja
Represented By: Anya Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Charles James Snyder
Represented By: Heidi S Inman
Represented By: Lisa Lin Ricksecker
Represented By: Meghan Rohling Kelly
Represented By: Morgan A Gower
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: William Wayne Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goknur Gida Maddeleri Enerji Imalat Ithalat Ihracat Ticaret ve Sanayi A.S.,
Represented By: Anya Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: Charles James Snyder
Represented By: Marc S Williams
Represented By: Naomi K Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: The Honorable Rosalyn Chapman (Ret.)
Represented By: Rosalyn Chapman (Ret.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fallon Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?