Camil Kreit v. Acer Capital Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Camil Kreit MD
Defendant: ACG Capital Group LLC, Acer Capital Group Inc, Acer Capital Group LLC, Caliber Capital Management LLC, Caliber Medical Partners II LLC, Calibert Partnership I LLC, Does, Paul A Garcia, Roes and Richard Woods
Case Number: 8:2015cv01881
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J. Carney
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Scott
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 (IN CHAMBERS): Order Re: Judgment Debtor Richard Woods Failure to Respond to the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 91 ) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/17/2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Richard Woods Should Not Be Sanctioned for Failing to Appear for Judgment Debtor Examination by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Within thirty (30) days of receiving the OSC via mail, Judgment Debtor shall show cause in writing, if any he has, why he should not be sanctioned (monetarily or in some other way) for failing to comply with the Order to Appear. (See document for details.) (sbou)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff Camil Kreit and against Defendants ACG Capital Group, LLC, Acer Capital Group, Inc., Acer Capital Group, LLC, Paul Garcia, Caliber Partnership I, LLC, Caliber Medic al Partners II, LLC, Caliber Capital Management, LLC, and Richard Woods, in accordance with the terms of the Court's Order granting Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. The Court AWARDS Plaintiff $250,000 in damages and $500,000 in exemplary damages. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (dro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camil Kreit v. Acer Capital Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACG Capital Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Capital Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Capital Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Medical Partners II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calibert Partnership I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camil Kreit MD
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?