P & A Marketing, Inc. et al v. Anna's Linens, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: P & A Marketing, Inc, P & A Marketing, Inc., Welcome Industrial Corporation, Panda Home Fashions LLC and Shewak Lajwanti Home Fashions, Inc.
Defendant: Anna's Linens, Inc, DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Anna's Linens, Inc., Scott Gladstone, Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Shepherd Pryor, Janet Grove, J.E. Rick Bunka, Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Loren Pannier, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Alan Gladstone and Kevin Reilly
Case Number: 8:2016cv00227
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H King
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge George H. King: Case should have been closed on entry dated 02/29/2016. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court [Dkt. 1] by Judge George H. King: After considering the relevant factors, we decline to exercise our discretion to withdraw the reference for this case at this time. Accordingly, Moving Defendants' Motion is DENIED without prejudice to Moving Defendants again requesting withdrawal after all pretrial matters in this action have been resolved in the bankruptcy court. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 17, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven T Gubner on behalf of Plaintiffs P & A Marketing, Inc., Panda Home Fashions LLC, Shewak Lajwanti Home Fashions, Inc., Welcome Industrial Corporation (Attorney Steven T Gubner added to party P & A Marketing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Steven T Gubner added to party Panda Home Fashions LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Steven T Gubner added to party Shewak Lajwanti Home Fashions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Steven T Gubner added to party Welcome Industrial Corporation(pty:pla))(Gubner, Steven)
February 12, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) - #7 #8 #9 . PRO HAC VICE fees were paid in Bankruptcy Court. (jtil)
February 11, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , to District Judge George H. King. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (jtil)
February 11, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application sent to Joseph P. Davis for Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Salus Capital Partners, LLC Re: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil)
February 11, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application sent to Paul T. Martin for Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Salus Capital Partners, LLC Re Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil)
February 11, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application sent to Nancy A. Mitchell for Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, and Salus Capital Partners, LLC Re Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil)
February 10, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 to District Judge George H. King. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (jtil)
February 10, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 served on 2/10/16. (Davis, Jeffry)
February 10, 2016 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, identifying Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Company. (Attorney Jeffry A Davis added to party Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Davis, Jeffry)
February 9, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Salus Capital Partners, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:15-bk-13008-TA (Steinberg, Howard)
February 9, 2016 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Salus Capital Partners, LLC, (Steinberg, Howard)
February 9, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD, Salus Capital Partners, LLC. (Steinberg, Howard)
February 9, 2016 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 8:15-ap-01482-TA to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 8:15-bk-13008-TA Receipt No: 0973-17256835 - Fee: $150, filed by Defendants Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, Downtown Capital Partners, LLC, Salus Capital Partners, LLC, DCP Linens Lenders, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD. (Attorney Howard J Steinberg added to party DCP Linens Lenders, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Howard J Steinberg added to party Downtown Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Howard J Steinberg added to party Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Howard J Steinberg added to party Salus Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft))(Steinberg, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P & A Marketing, Inc. et al v. Anna's Linens, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna's Linens, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCP Linens Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Howard J Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD
Represented By: Howard J Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna's Linens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salus Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Howard J Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Rick Bunka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Laurence Schoen
Represented By: Jeffry A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Pannier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Howard J Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P & A Marketing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P & A Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T Gubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welcome Industrial Corporation
Represented By: Steven T Gubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panda Home Fashions LLC
Represented By: Steven T Gubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shewak Lajwanti Home Fashions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T Gubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?