Michelle Resnick et al v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Resnick, Carmen Ozdemir, Scott Schieber, Daniella Tirone, Leida Thomas, Lorraine Strand, Lauren Freed, Patricia Reynolds, Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Tara Mulrey, William Geers, Krista Verstraete, Elizabeth Vargo and Paul Sandlin
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc, Kia Motors America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd and Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00593
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #107 filed by Christopher Baker, Elizabeth Vargo, Patricia Reynolds, Michelle Resnick, Krista Verstraete, Scott Schieber, Paul Sandlin, Lorraine Strand, Carmen Ozdemir, Lauren Freed, Daniella Tirone, Leida Thomas, Tara Mulrey, William Geers, Shelby Cramer. CCA # 17-56434. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (mat)
September 21, 2017 Filing 108 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56434 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #107 as to Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (car)
September 20, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, #106 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20540170.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Part 2 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Part 3 Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Martin, Jean)
August 21, 2017 Filing 106 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #97 This Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED with prejudice( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (rfi)
August 15, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by David C Wright attorney for Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. Changing firm name to McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP and address to 3281 East Guasti Road, Suite 100, Ontario, California 91761. Filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Wright, David)
August 7, 2017 Filing 104 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING Hearing held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: re: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATEDCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (filed 5/30/2017) #97 Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on the motion and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (rfi)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court DENIES the Request for Leave to file File One-Page Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Supplemental Authority and will not consider the attachment as Exhibit A at (Dkt. 101) (Request) filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (together Hyundai Defendants). #102 (rfi)
August 1, 2017 Filing 102 REQUEST for Leave to file One-Page Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority [Dkt.101] filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Cho, Dyanne)
July 31, 2017 Filing 101 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #97 (Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition) filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Wright, David)
July 27, 2017 Filing 100 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #97 . The Motion currently set for hearing on 7/31/2017 is hereby CONTINUED to 8/7/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2017 Filing 99 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #97 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd. (Cho, Dyanne)
June 26, 2017 Filing 98 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #97 (Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Wright, David)
May 30, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Order) (Cho, Dyanne)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #95 GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that:(1) The Hyundai Defendants' anticipated joint responsive motion to theFACCAC shall be filed not later than May 30, 2017. (rfi)
May 17, 2017 Filing 95 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #94 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Dyanne)
May 8, 2017 Filing 94 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defedants All Defendants amending Consolidated Complaint, #70 , filed by Plaintiffs Leida Thomas, Tara Mulrey, Scott Schieber, Michelle Resnick, Elizabeth Vargo, Daniella Tirone, Krista Verstraete, Lorraine Strand, Paul Sandlin, Carmen Ozdemir, Patricia Reynolds(Attorney Jean S Martin added to party Carmen Ozdemir(pty:pla))(Martin, Jean)
April 13, 2017 Filing 93 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, with the exception of Ms. Tirone's MUDTPA claim, which is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs are ordered to file an amended complaint, if any, no later than Monday, May 8, 2017, by 4:00 p.m. #80 (rfi)
April 10, 2017 Filing 92 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING Hearing held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (filed 2/17/2017) #80 Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on the motion(s) and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
March 31, 2017 Filing 91 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Cho, Dyanne)
March 31, 2017 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (McCune, Richard)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 The Court ORDERS the parties to provide supplemental briefs providing the Court with their positions as to whether and, if so, how the Williams decision affects the instant case. The supplemental briefs are not to exceed five (5) pages in length and are due by Friday, March 31, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Monday, April 10, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.: (rfi)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue, #87 GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the Court continues the hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss to March 27, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. All other dates set by the Court remain unchanged. IT IS SO ORDERED.DATED: March 20, 2017 (rfi)
March 17, 2017 Filing 87 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from March 21, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 86 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Dyanne)
March 17, 2017 Filing 86 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 . The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing on this matter. The motion will be heard on Tuesday, March 21, 2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 6, 2017 Filing 85 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Cho, Dyanne)
February 27, 2017 Filing 84 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Carmen Ozdemir, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Christopher Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Shelby Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Lauren Freed(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party William Geers(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Tara Mulrey(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Carmen Ozdemir(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Michelle Resnick(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Patricia Reynolds(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Paul Sandlin(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Scott Schieber(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Lorraine Strand(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Leida Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Daniella Tirone(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Elizabeth Vargo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Barcenilla added to party Krista Verstraete(pty:pla))(Barcenilla, Tammy)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #73 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jean S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schiebe r, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete, designating David C Wright as local counsel. (jp)
February 21, 2017 Filing 82 EXHIBIT 1 - Certificate of Good Standing to EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jean S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, #73 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Wright, David)
February 17, 2017 Filing 81 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #80 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice)(Cho, Dyanne)
February 17, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, #2 DECLARATION OF ERIC Y. KIZIRIAN REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7-3, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Cho, Dyanne)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATIONS #78 FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION THERETO, AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Based on the Stipulation and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the Court grants the parties a 10-page extended page limitation for Defendants' anticipated joint motion to dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (35 total pages), Plaintiffs' opposition thereto (35 total pages), and Defendants' anticipated reply in support of the motion to dismiss (20 total pages). All other page limits set by the Local Rules for other briefs or motions are not changed by this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jy)
February 14, 2017 Filing 78 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Plaintiffs' Opposition Thereto, and Defendants' Reply Brief filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Dyanne)
February 10, 2017 Filing 77 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jean S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, #73 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Counsel shall lodge a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days of the filing of the application no later than February 21, 2017. (jloz)
February 9, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jean S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, #73 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting #65 #72 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo and Krista Verstraete designating David C Wright as local counsel. (lom)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting #64 #71 Non-Resident Attorney John A Yanchunis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo and Krista Verstraete, designating David C Wright as local counsel. (lom) Modified on 2/7/2017 (lom).
February 3, 2017 Filing 73 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jean S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19308407) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Mich elle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
February 3, 2017 Filing 72 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 1/20/2017, Receipt No. 2607MURM) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
February 3, 2017 Filing 71 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 1/20/2017, Receipt No. 2607MSSU) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
February 3, 2017 Filing 70 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: #58 Amended Complaint/Petition,, filed by Plaintiffs Leida Thomas, Tara Mulrey, William Geers, Scott Schieber, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Elizabeth Vargo, Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Daniella Tirone, Krista Verstraete, Lorraine Strand, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, Carmen Ozdemir(Attorney David C Wright added to party Carmen Ozdemir(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION #68 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The following actions: a. Resnick v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc., et al., Case No. 8:16-cv-00593; and b. Ozdemir v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc., et al., Case No. 8:16-cv-01820 are consolidated. Beginning with the date on this Order, all filings in these cases shall only be made in the Resnick case, Case No. 16-cv-00593 and shall only reflect this case number. The Ozdemir case, Case No. 16-cv-01820, is administratively closed.Defendants January 31, 2017 deadlines to respond to the Second Amended Complaint in Resnick and the original Complaint in Odzemir are vacated. The Consolidated Class Action Complaint provided as Exhibit provided as Exhibit 1 to the Parties Joint Stipulation shall be filed by the plaintiff no later than February 3, 2017.Within 14 days after the entry of this Order and the filing of the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Defendants will file a response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (lc)
January 27, 2017 Filing 68 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:16-CV-00593-BRO-JPW; 8:16-CV-01820-BRO-JPW filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One - Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Wright, David)
January 24, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorra #65 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing date set, but no hearing required. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
January 24, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorrai #64 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing date set, but no hearing required. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
January 20, 2017 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick A. Barthle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19228004) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. Application set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
January 20, 2017 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19227824) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle R esnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. Application set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #62 Based on the Stipulation and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that Defendants' complaint response date is further continued to January 31, 2017.IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi)
January 9, 2017 Filing 62 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reponse as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #58 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Dyanne)
January 5, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE TO PARTIES by Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Effective, January 4, 2017, Judge Walsh will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 790 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 790 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Walsh's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Isabel Martinez, may be reached at (213) 894-8958. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Extension of Time #59 Based on the Stipulation and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that the Hyundai Defendants' complaint response date is continued to January 16, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi)
December 9, 2016 Filing 59 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Hyundai Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #58 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Dyanne)
November 28, 2016 Filing 58 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 , filed by Plaintiffs Leida Thomas, Tara Mulrey, William Geers, Scott Schieber, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Elizabeth Vargo, Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Daniella Tirone, Krista Verstraete, Lorraine Strand, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds(Wright, David)
November 14, 2016 Filing 57 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, except for Ms. Cramers LUTPA claim, which is DISMISSED with prejudice. As all of Plaintiffs claims are dismissed, Defendants' Motion to Strike Class Allegations is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Second Amended Complaint, if any, by 4:00 p.m. on November 28, 2016.IT IS SO ORDERED. #40 #42 #43 (rfi)
November 10, 2016 Filing 56 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. ORDER VACATING HEARING. The Court has pending, 1) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #40 (Filed 9/9/16); 2) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE NATIONWIDE CLASS ALLEGATION IN CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION #42 (Filed 9/9/16) The Court concludes that the matter is appropriate for resolution without the argument of counsel. Accordingly, the hearing previously scheduled for Monday, November 14, 2016 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby VACATED. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. IT IS SO ORDERED THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2016 Filing 55 REPLY In Support Of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Cho, Dyanne)
October 28, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY In Support Of Motion to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 #42 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Cho, Dyanne)
October 24, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge O'Connell will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 7C on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation as to Replies #51 is GRANTED. The Court will allow the defendants a 10-page extended page limitation for the reply in support of their motion to dismiss plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint, and a 10-page extended page limitation for their reply in support of their motion to strike nationwide class allegations from plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint. All other page limits set by the Local Rules for other briefs or motions are not changed by this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw)
October 18, 2016 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Zourik Zarifian added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Zourik Zarifian added to party Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Zourik Zarifian added to party Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zourik Zarifian added to party KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc(pty:dft))(Zarifian, Zourik)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting #47 Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F Coleman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete, designating David C Wright as local counsel. (jp)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting #46 Non-Resident Attorney Lisa A White APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete, designating David C Wright as local counsel. (jp)
October 12, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine #47 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine S #46 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
October 12, 2016 Filing 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18704267) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Res nick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Wright, David)
October 12, 2016 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18704181) filed by plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resni ck, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attorney David C Wright added to party William Geers(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Scott Schieber(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Lorraine Strand(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Leida Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Daniella Tirone(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Elizabeth Vargo(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Krista Verstraete(pty:pla)) (Wright, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (McCune, Richard)
October 7, 2016 Filing 44 OPPOSITION to Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 #43 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 #42 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of State Authority)(McCune, Richard)
September 9, 2016 Filing 43 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs' Corrected FAC, #2 State Law Variations Appendix in Support of Motion to Strike, #3 Proposed Order) (Cho, Dyanne)
September 9, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Nationwide Class Allegations in Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amneded Class Action Complaint, #2 Appendix in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike, #3 Proposed Order) (Cho, Dyanne)
September 9, 2016 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Cho, Dyanne)
September 9, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint) (Cho, Dyanne)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFFS'OPPOSITION THERETO [DKT. 38] by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. See order for details. (jy)
September 2, 2016 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiffs' Opposition Thereto filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Page Limitations for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiffs' Opposition)(Attorney Dyanne Jinhyung Cho added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dyanne Jinhyung Cho added to party Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Dyanne Jinhyung Cho added to party Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dyanne Jinhyung Cho added to party KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc(pty:dft))(Cho, Dyanne)
August 30, 2016 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Correct First Amended Complaint #35 as to defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (jp)
August 29, 2016 Filing 36 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #35 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Daniella Tirone, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (McCune, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Filing 35 CORRECTED First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #29 , filed by Plaintiffs Leida Thomas, Tara Mulrey, William Geers, Scott Schieber, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Elizabeth Vargo, Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Daniella Tirone, Krista Verstraete, Lorraine Strand, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CLRA Venue Affidavits)(Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Daniella Tirone(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete, Daniella Tirone. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #29 , Summons Request, #32 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Corrected Amended Complaint/Petition)(McCune, Richard)
August 18, 2016 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #29 as to defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (jp)
August 17, 2016 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #29 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (Wright, David)
August 17, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #30 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:"section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
August 15, 2016 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #29 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Baker, Shelby Cramer, Lauren Freed, William Geers, Tara Mulrey, Michelle Resnick, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Sandlin, Scott Schieber, Lorraine Strand, Leida Thomas, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete. (McCune, Richard)
August 15, 2016 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, Scott Schieber, Leida Thomas, Elizabeth Vargo, Krista Verstraete, Lorraine Strand, William Geers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CLRA Venue Affidavits)(Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Lorraine Strand(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party William Geers(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Krista Verstraete(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Scott Schieber(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Leida Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Elizabeth Vargo(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint and for Scheduling on Responsive Pleading #27 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that Plaintiffs must file their a First Amended Complaint on or before 8/15/2016; The Hyundai Defendants shall file an Answer to the First Amended Complaint, motion to dismiss, and/or other response no later than 9/9/2016; If applicable, Plaintiffs shall file their response to any motion filed by the Hyundai Defendants no later than 10/7/2016; The Hyundai Defendants shall file any reply no later than 10/28/2016; The hearing on any motion filed by the Hyundai Defendants as their responsive pleading will be held on 11/14/2016 t 1:30 PM. (jp)
August 5, 2016 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File for Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint and Stipulation for Scheduling Order for Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc(pty:dft))(Grimaldi, Michael)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #25 Based on the Stipulation and GOOD CAUSE APEPARING, the Court vacates the current Complaint response dates of HMA, HMC, KMMG, and HMMA and sets a single uniform complaint response date of August 5, 2016 for all Defendants. (rfi)
June 17, 2016 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 5, 2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by DEFENDANTS Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric)
June 17, 2016 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, (Attorney Eric Y Kizirian added to party Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #22 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulated complaint response deadline of June 27, 2016 for defendants HMA and KMMG is hereby extended by three (3) additional days, up to and including June 30, 2016. (rfi)
May 27, 2016 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to JUNE 30, 2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by DEFENDANTS Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric)
May 27, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc, identifying KIA MOTOR AMERICA, KIA MOTORS CORPORATION, AND HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Eric Y Kizirian added to party KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
May 27, 2016 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, identifying HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC.. (Attorney Eric Y Kizirian added to party Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
May 27, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Hyundai Motor America, Inc., identifying HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Eric Y Kizirian added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
May 27, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Wright, David)
May 24, 2016 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, upon Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. served on 5/6/2016, answer due 5/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Valerie Villegas, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wright, David)
May 24, 2016 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. served on 5/6/2016, answer due 5/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Valerie Villegas, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wright, David)
May 24, 2016 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, upon Defendant Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC served on 5/6/2016, answer due 5/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wright, David)
May 24, 2016 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Baker, Lauren Freed, Tara Mulrey, Shelby Cramer, Michelle Resnick, Paul Sandlin, Patricia Reynolds, upon Defendant KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc served on 5/6/2016, answer due 5/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wright, David)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
March 31, 2016 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd, Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, KIA Motors Manufacturing Georgia, Inc, Kia Motors America, Inc. (jp)
March 31, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 . The following error(s) was found: The court does not issue single summonses to individual defendants. Multiple Requests for Summons on Complaint were e-filed, only one request is required. The Summons has been issued. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (jp)
March 31, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
March 31, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jp)
March 30, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN, identifying Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co. LTD, Hyundai Motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC, Kia Motors Manufacturing Georgia, Inc.. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, SHELBY CRAMER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, MICHELLE RESNICK, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, PATRICIA REYNOLDS, PAUL SANDLIN, Movants SHELBY CRAMER, MICHELLE RESNICK. (McCune, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17560063 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, LAUREN FREED, TARA MULREY, SHELBY CRAMER, MICHELLE RESNICK, PAUL SANDLIN, PATRICIA REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party CHRISTOPHER BAKER(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party SHELBY CRAMER(pty:bkmov), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party LAUREN FREED(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party TARA MULREY(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party MICHELLE RESNICK(pty:bkmov), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party PATRICIA REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party PAUL SANDLIN(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Resnick et al v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Resnick
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Ozdemir
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Schieber
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella Tirone
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leida Thomas
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Strand
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Freed
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynolds
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Baker
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Cramer
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Mulrey
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Geers
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Verstraete
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Vargo
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sandlin
Represented By: Tammy Barcenilla
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, III
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai motor Manufacturing Alabama LLC
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Michael Keith Grimaldi
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motors manufacturing Georgia, Inc
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Michael Keith Grimaldi
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co. Ltd
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Michael Keith Grimaldi
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Michael Keith Grimaldi
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?