Abufarie v. Zeiadeh, et al.
Plaintiff: Vape Society Supply Corp. and Ala Abufarie
Defendant: Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, Amir Nathan Dawood, IPURCHASE ONLINE a California corporation doing business as TJZ Enterprises, Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Andy Michael Ibrahim and Nathan Aziz Dawood an individual doing business as Dawood and Dawood
Counter Defendant: E Juice Vapor Inc, Does 1 through 100, High Society Supply Inc, Miguel Berio, Dough Boy Pizza, Roes and Puff Smoke Shop Inc
Interested Party: Mr. Ala Abufarie
Counter Claimant: Ipurchase Online Inc
Case Number: 8:2016cv01971
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
2 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER STAYING THE ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY UNTIL NO LATER THAN MAY 30, 2018 PENDING RESOLUTION OF ALL SETTLEMENT TERMS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: After full consideration of the matter and good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties Notice of Conditional Settlement And Stipulated Request To Stay The Action In Its Entirety Until No Later Than May 30, 2018. All pending dates in this matter are hereby vacated and this matter is stayed in its entirety until no later than May 30, 2018. In the event all Settlement Agreement terms are satisfied prior to May 30, 2018, the parties are ordered to file a request for dismissal of the action in its entirety with prejudice within (3) three business days of said satisfaction. Case stayed., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dv)
November 3, 2017 Filing 109 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of All Settlement Terms filed by Plaintiff Ala Abufarie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Hardacre, Colin)
October 23, 2017 Filing 108 MINUTES OF Telephonic Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer. Court Reporter: CS 10/20/17. (twdb)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #104 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (es)
October 17, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Vape Society Supply Corp. and, MOTION for Sanctions as to: (1) Deponent Vape Society Supply Corp.and its counsel for failing to designate any witnesses, to attend its deposition, or to participate in the meet and confer process (pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 37(a)(5)(A), 37(a)(5)(C), 37(d)(3), and L.R. 37-4); and (2) against Ala Abufarie and his counsel for interfering with the duly-noticed deposition of a party, and for failure to cooperate in the meet and confer process (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 37(a)(5)(A), L.R. 37-4, and the Courts inherent power to deter bad faith and frivolous conduct) filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Walton, Lewis)
October 16, 2017 Filing 105 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The Court sets a Telephonic Discovery Conference for 10/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will provide call-in information via separate email. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 9, 2017 Filing 104 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants and Counterclaimaints Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDougall, Masai)
September 22, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Counter-Claimant Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual), upon Counter-Defendant Puff Smoke Shop Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Colin Hardacre, Counsel. (McDougall, Masai)
September 21, 2017 Filing 102 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Counter-Claimants Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual), upon Counter-Defendant High Society Supply Inc served on 9/19/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Meagan Schuman, Customer Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Walton, Lewis)
September 21, 2017 Filing 101 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Counter-Claimants Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual), upon Counter-Defendant Dough Boy Pizza served on 9/18/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Danny Ramos, Store Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Walton, Lewis)
September 21, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Counter-Claimants Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual), upon Counter-Defendant E Juice Vapor Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/6/2017, answer due 9/27/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Colin Hardacre, Esq., Attorney for Counter-Defendant E-Juice Vapor, Inc.. (Walton, Lewis)
August 7, 2017 Filing 99 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #96 of Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh and Purchase Online, Inc. filed by Nominal Defendant and Counterdefendant Vape Society Supply Corp..(Bisol, Brian)
August 7, 2017 Filing 98 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #96 and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Ala Abufarie.(Genish, Jonathan)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Granting Leave to File Second Amended Answer re Stipulation #95 . (twdb)
July 17, 2017 Filing 96 First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendants Ala Abufarie(an individual), Miguel Berio, Does, Dough Boy Pizza, E Juice Vapor Inc, High Society Supply Inc, Puff Smoke Shop Inc, Roes, Vape Society Supply Corp.(a California Corporation) amending Counterclaim, #83 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Counter-Claimant Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual)(McDougall, Masai)
July 17, 2017 Filing 95 STIPULATION for Leave to Amend First Amended Answer filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(McDougall, Masai)
July 17, 2017 Filing 94 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #83 as to Counter Defendant Puff Smoke Shop Inc. (es)
July 17, 2017 Filing 93 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #83 as to Counter Defendant High Society Supply Inc. (es)
July 17, 2017 Filing 92 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #83 as to Counter Defendant E Juice Vapor Inc. (es)
July 17, 2017 Filing 91 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #83 as to Counter Defendant Dough Boy Pizza. (es)
July 17, 2017 Filing 90 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #83 as to Counter Defendant Miguel Berio. (es)
July 14, 2017 Filing 89 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim, #83 filed by Counter-Claimant Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McDougall, Masai)
July 13, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #87 . The following error(s) was found: Summons as to Counter-Claim should be specified on Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
July 12, 2017 Filing 87 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim, #83 filed by Counter-Claimant Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McDougall, Masai)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Changing Case Name and Caption by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #85 . (twdb)
June 30, 2017 Filing 85 STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Ipurchase Online Inc(a California Corporation), West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh(an individual). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDougall, Masai)
June 27, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Counterclaim, #83 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. Indicate which document the summons is in regards to. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
June 26, 2017 Filing 83 COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Ala Abufarie, Vape Society Supply Corp.; Jury Demand, filed by Counter-Claimaint IPURCHASE ONLINE, Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McDougall, Masai)
June 26, 2017 Filing 82 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #80 filed by Defendant Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (McDougall, Masai)
June 5, 2017 Filing 81 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #80 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh.(Walton, Lewis)
May 22, 2017 Filing 80 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Vape Society Supply Corp., West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 , filed by Plaintiff Ala Abufarie(Kaufman, Gary)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT #74 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: This matter is appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The Court VACATES the May 22, 2017 hearing. (Dkt. No. 74.) For these reasons, and consistent with the liberal policy favoring amendment of pleadings under Rule 15, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion to file a second amended complaint. (es)
April 28, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Second Amended Complaint #74 filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Walton, Lewis)
April 25, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Proposed Plaintiff Ala Abufarie, identifying Vape Society Supply Corp., a California corporation; Ala Abufarie, an individual; Miguel Berio, an individual; Tariq Jihad Zeideh, an individual; Amir Nathan Dawood, an individual and dba Dawood and Dawood; Dawood & Company, a California corporation; iPurchase Online, a California corporation and dba TJZ Enterprises; West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., a California corporation; Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, an individual; Andy Michael Ibrahim, an individual; Akram Naser Diab, an individual. (Kaufman, Gary)
April 24, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan M Genish on behalf of Interested Party Ala Abufarie (Attorney Jonathan M Genish added to party Ala Abufarie(pty:ip))(Genish, Jonathan)
April 24, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Colin Hardacre on behalf of Interested Party Ala Abufarie (Attorney Colin Hardacre added to party Ala Abufarie(pty:ip))(Hardacre, Colin)
April 24, 2017 Filing 74 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Proposed Plaintiff Ala Abufarie, Vape Society Supply Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Genish, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan M. Genish, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jonathan M. Genish, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jonathan M. Genish, #5 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #6 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) (Kaufman, Gary)
April 24, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gary Jay Kaufman on behalf of Interested Party Ala Abufarie (Attorney Gary Jay Kaufman added to party Ala Abufarie(pty:ip))(Kaufman, Gary)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES: Discovery cut-off 12/6/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2018 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 9:00 am. (lb)
February 27, 2017 Filing 71 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held: Discovery cut-off 12/6/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb)
February 20, 2017 Filing 70 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 12-14 days, filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp... (Bisol, Brian)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Motions to Dismiss Without Prejudice #52 #53 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Going forward, the Court encourages the parties to take this opportunity to bring order out of chaos, and focus on the merits of this litigation. Because the moving parties failed to comply with Local Rule 7-3, the Court DENIES both motions to dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Dkt. Nos. 52, 53.) The Court ORDERS the parties to meet in person, civilly discuss the issues raised in the pleadings, motions, and this Order, and attempt to find a mutually agreeable solution. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-3. See document for further information. (lwag)
February 6, 2017 Filing 68 MINUTES OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT 52] and MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE PRAYERS FOR RELIEF 2-9 [DKT 53] held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Counsel submit on the tentative ruling. The Court orders that the tentative ruling shall become the order of the Court. A separate order to issue. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (ig)
January 20, 2017 Filing 67 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order Continuing Hearing. For reasons of calendar management, the Court CONTINUES the pending motions to dismiss currently set on January 30, 2017 at 10:00 a.m to February 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. (Dkt. Nos. 52, 53.) (mt)
January 16, 2017 Filing 66 REPLY To Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case And For a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e)) #52 filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(McDougall, Masai)
January 12, 2017 Filing 64 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting Motion to Remand and Striking Related Docket Entries #51 . This matter is appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The Court VACATES the January 23, 2017 hearing. Zeiadeh has filed a motion to remand. Putting aside whether such a motion is the best way to handle this irregular situation, the Court GRANTS the motion to remand, while DENYING the request for fees. (Dkt. No. 51.) The clerk is instructed to strike all docket entries, party appearances, and caption entries related to the irregular removal attempt. (Dkt. Nos. 19, 46.) (see document for additional details) (mba)
January 10, 2017 Filing 62 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #51 filed by Counter Claimant Tariq Jihad Zediaeh. (Walton, Lewis)
January 9, 2017 Filing 65 MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [DKT 20] Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb)
January 9, 2017 Filing 63 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injuction #20 . (ig)
January 9, 2017 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , for a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e), and to Strike Prayers for Relief 2-9 (FRCP 12(f)(2)) #53 filed by Counter Defendant Ala Abufarie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian E. Bisol in Support of Ala Abufarie's Opposition to Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (FRCP 12(b)(6)), For a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e)), and to Strike Prayers for Relief 2 - 9 (FRCP 12(f)(2))(Bisol, Brian)
January 9, 2017 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case And For a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e)) #52 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , for a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e), and to Strike Prayers for Relief 2-9 (FRCP 12(f)(2)) #53 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 3, #2 Declaration of Brian E. Bisol in Support of Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Bisol, Brian)
January 9, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case And For a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e)) #52 (Walton, Lewis)
January 5, 2017 Filing 58 Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted on Reply re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 filed by Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Alham Nabeeh Benyameen(pty:dft), Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Nathan Aziz Dawood(pty:dft), Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Dawood & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party IPURCHASE ONLINE(pty:dft), Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Andy Michael Ibrahim(pty:dft))(McDougall, Masai)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 9:00 am before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lb)
January 2, 2017 Filing 56 REPLY IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 RESPONSE TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 67 to 82, #2 Declaration of Miguel ("Mike") Berio, #3 Declaration Supplemental of Martin C. Dante, #4 Declaration Supplemental of Alan Lopez, #5 Declaration Supplemental of Ian Kennedy, #6 Declaration of Krysta Maher, #7 Declaration of Anthony Sykes, #8 Declaration Supplemental of Ala Abufarie, #9 Supplement Supplemental Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Request for Preliminary Injunction)(Bisol, Brian)
January 2, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #51 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp., Counter Defendant Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian E. Bisol in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand and for Attorney's Fees)(Bisol, Brian)
January 2, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Vape Society Supply Corp. and Counterdefendant Ala Abufarie Vape Society Supply Corp., Vape Society Supply Corp.. of Filing Written Notice of Removal with California Superior Court for the County of Orange and Service on Counsel for Defendant and Counterdefendant Tariq Zeiadeh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bisol, Brian)
December 28, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , for a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e), and to Strike Prayers for Relief 2-9 (FRCP 12(f)(2)) filed by Counter-Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walton, Lewis)
December 28, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case And For a More Definite Statement (FRCP 12(e)) filed by All Defendants Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Amir Nathan Dawood, Nathan Aziz Dawood, Dawood & Company, Akram Naser Diab, IPURCHASE ONLINE, Andy Michael Ibrahim, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Alham Nabeeh Benyameen(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Amir Nathan Dawood(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Nathan Aziz Dawood(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Dawood & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Akram Naser Diab(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party IPURCHASE ONLINE(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party Andy Michael Ibrahim(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Richard Walton, Jr added to party West Coast Vape Supply, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Walton, Lewis)
December 22, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Superior Court Plaintiff and Counterclaimant Herein Tariq Jihad Zediaeh. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Richard Walton I/S/O Motions for Remand and for Just Costs, #2 Declaration of Masai McDougall I/S/O Motions for Remand and for Just Costs, #3 Request for Judicial Notice I/S/O Motions for Remand and for Just Costs, #4 Proposed Order) (Walton, Lewis)
December 19, 2016 Filing 50 to Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Al Abufarie filed by Defendant West Coast Vape Supply, Inc.. (McDougall, Masai)
December 19, 2016 Filing 49 Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 filed by Defendant Amir Nathan Dawood. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Amir Nathan Dawood(pty:dft))(McDougall, Masai)
December 19, 2016 Filing 48 Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 filed by Defendant Akram Naser Diab. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party Akram Naser Diab(pty:dft))(McDougall, Masai)
December 19, 2016 Filing 47 to Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 filed by Defendant West Coast Vape Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Declaration, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Attorney Masai Dennis McDougall added to party West Coast Vape Supply, Inc.(pty:dft))(McDougall, Masai)
December 9, 2016 Filing 46 ***STRICKEN*** COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendants Tariq Zeiadeh, Amir Nathan Dawood, Dawood & Company, IPurchase Online, West Coast Vape Supply, Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Akram Naser Diab All Defendants ; Jury Demand, filed by Counterclaimant Ala Abufarie. (Attorney Brian Edward Bisol added to party Ala Abufarie(pty:cc))(Bisol, Brian) Modified on 1/13/2017 (mba).
December 8, 2016 Filing 45 Notice / CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Counterdefendant Ala Abufarie, (Bisol, Brian)
December 8, 2016 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Counterdefendant Ala Abufarie.(Bisol, Brian)
December 8, 2016 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Counterdefendant Vape Society Supply Corp..(Bisol, Brian)
December 8, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Notice of Ruling on Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp. and Notice Scheduling an Order to Show Cause Regarding Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #41 , filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bisol, Brian)
November 30, 2016 Filing 41 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order Regarding Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for A Temporary Restraining Order #20 . The Court DENIES the request for a temporary restraining order, but GRANTS the request for an Order to Show Cause regarding issuance of a preliminary injunction. (Dkt. No. 20.) The Court will hold a hearing on the matter on Monday, January 9, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to reasonably ensure that all parties receive timely notice of this Order. Defendants who have not yet filed an opposition may do so by December 19, 2016, and Plaintiff may file a reply to all oppositions by January 2, 2016. (mt)
November 28, 2016 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Akram Naser Diab. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Andy Michael Ibrahim. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Alham Nabeeh Benyameen. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant West Coast Vape Supply, Inc. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant IPURCHASE ONLINE. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Dawood & Company. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 34 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Amir Nathan Dawood. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (mba)
November 28, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:16-cv-01971 AG(DFMx). (rn)
November 27, 2016 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 filed by Defendant Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Declaration, #14 Exhibit, #15 Declaration, #16 Exhibit)(McDougall, Masai)
November 23, 2016 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 Certificate of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp. (Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media #20 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bisol, Brian)
November 23, 2016 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction to Restore & Transfer Access and Exclusive Control of Plaintiff's domain, Plaintiff's website, Plaintiff's email account, and Plaintiff's social media accounts, Plaintiff's copyrighted material and plaintiff's trademarks filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp. filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 11/23/2016 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Brian E. Bisol, #3 Exhibit 1 to 24, #4 Exhibit 25 to 32, #5 Exhibit 33 to 34, #6 Exhibit 35 to 37, #7 Exhibit 38 to 39, #8 Exhibit 40 to 44, #9 Exhibit 45 to 54, #10 Exhibit 55 to 63, #11 Exhibit 64 to 66, #12 Declaration of Alan Lopez, #13 Declaration of Martin C. Dante, #14 Declaration of Christopher R. Royce, #15 Declaration of Ryan Kennedy, #16 Declaration of Ehab Abufarie, #17 Declaration of Ala Abufarie, #18 Declaration Ian Kennedy, #19 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bisol, Brian)
November 22, 2016 Filing 19 ***STRICKEN*** COUNTERCLAIM filed as NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp., Counter Defendants Ala Abufarie, Vape Society Supply Corp. of California Superior Court Case No. 30-2016-00885365 Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1441(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Bisol, Brian) Modified on 11/23/2016 (lwag). Modified on 1/13/2017 (mba).
November 10, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 , Summons Request #12 , Summons Request #11 , Summons Request #14 , Summons Request #16 , Summons Request #10 , Summons Request #13 , Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The defendant's name must appear in the "To:" section of the summons exactly as it appears on the complaint and in the caption of the summons.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (dro)
November 9, 2016 Filing 17 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp., identifying Vape Society Supply Corp., Ala Abufarie, Miguel Berio, Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh, Amir Nathan Dawood d.b,a. Dawood and Dawood, Dawood & Company, iPurchase Online d.b.a. TJZ Enterprises, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc., Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Akram Naser Diab. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
November 9, 2016 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh, Amir Nathan Dawood, dab Dawood and Dawood, Dawood & Company, Purchase Online, dab TJZ Enterprises, West Coast Vape Supply, Inc. Alham Nabeeh Benyameen, Andy Michael Ibrahim, Akram Naser Diab Amir Nathan Dawood, Dawood & Company, IPURCHASE ONLINE amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to F)(Bisol, Brian)
November 1, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
November 1, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (jtil)
October 29, 2016 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
October 29, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp., identifying Ala Abufarie, CEO of Plaintiff; Miguel Berio, Secretary of Plaintiff. (Bisol, Brian)
October 29, 2016 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Report on Filing Copyright etc. Part 2)(Bisol, Brian)
October 29, 2016 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Bisol, Brian)
October 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18803608 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Vape Society Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Brian Edward Bisol added to party Vape Society Supply Corp.(pty:pla))(Bisol, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abufarie v. Zeiadeh, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tariq Jihad Zeiadeh
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawood & Company
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akram Naser Diab
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Nathan Dawood
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPURCHASE ONLINE a California corporation doing business as TJZ Enterprises
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alham Nabeeh Benyameen
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Vape Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Michael Ibrahim
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Aziz Dawood an individual doing business as Dawood and Dawood
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vape Society Supply Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ala Abufarie
Represented By: Colin Hardacre
Represented By: Gary Jay Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan M Genish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: E Juice Vapor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: High Society Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Miguel Berio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dough Boy Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Puff Smoke Shop Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mr. Ala Abufarie
Represented By: Colin Hardacre
Represented By: Gary Jay Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan M Genish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ipurchase Online Inc
Represented By: Lewis Richard Walton, Jr
Represented By: Masai Dennis McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?