Veritrust Financial, LLC v. Sheri Pontolilo et al
Plaintiff: Veritrust Financial, LLC
Defendant: Sheri Pontolilo, American International Group Inc., Lexington Insurance Company, E and O Professional Risk Management and Insurance Services, LLC, Integro Ltd., Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Odyssey Investment Partners LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv00088
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Lexington Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Sarah)
November 19, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sheri Pontolilo. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment of Dismissal)(Hennessy, Sarah)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF INTEGRO LTD AND ODYSSEY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC ONLY #59 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Integro Ltd. and Odyssey Investment Partners LLC terminated. (es)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO LIFT STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF FILING THE DISMISSAL OF INTEGRO LTD. AND ODYSSEY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND ORIGINAL STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF MEDIATION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. #60 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the stay will be lifted for the limited purpose of filing requests for dismissal of Integro Ltd. and Odyssey Investment Partners LLC and that this action will remain stayed until March 22, 2018 to allow the parties to complete mediation of the case. (es)
December 22, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #59 (Ergastolo, Joseph)
December 22, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Lift Stay on Case #60 (Ergastolo, Joseph)
December 19, 2017 Filing 60 Joint STIPULATION to Lift Stay File Dismissal and Continue Stay filed by Defendants Integro Ltd., Odyssey Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ergastolo, Joseph)
December 19, 2017 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Integro Ltd., Odyssey Investment Partners LLC filed by Defendants Integro Ltd., Odyssey Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ergastolo, Joseph)
November 21, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #57 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every party's first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (dro)
November 20, 2017 Filing 57 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Integro Ltd. answer now due 12/27/2017; Odyssey Investment Partners LLC answer now due 12/27/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Integro Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Ergastolo, Joseph)
March 9, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph T Ergastolo on behalf of Defendants Integro Ltd., Odyssey Investment Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Joseph T Ergastolo added to party Integro Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph T Ergastolo added to party Odyssey Investment Partners LLC(pty:dft))(Ergastolo, Joseph)
March 7, 2017 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. upon Integro Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/2/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph T. Ergastolo. (Hennessy, Sarah)
March 7, 2017 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. upon Odyssey Investment Partners LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/2/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph T. Ergastolo. (Hennessy, Sarah)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING COMPLETION OF MEDIATION by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #52 . The Court has read and considered the parties' Stipulation To Stay Case Pending Completion Of Mediation signed by counsel for Plaintiff VERITRUST FINANCIAL, LLC and Defendants LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this action is stayed until October 1, 2017 to allow the parties to complete mediation of the case. Case stayed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dv)
March 3, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Mediation filed by Defendants American International Group Inc., Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Completion of Mediation)(Waxler, Andrew)
March 2, 2017 Filing 51 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant American International Group Inc. filed by Defendant American International Group Inc..(Waxler, Andrew)
March 2, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Returned Unexecuted #48 , Summons Returned Unexecuted #45 , Summons Returned Unexecuted #47 , Summons Returned Unexecuted #49 , Summons Returned Unexecuted #44 , Summons Returned Unexecuted #46 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv)
March 1, 2017 Filing 49 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to American International Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
March 1, 2017 Filing 48 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to E and O Professional Risk Management and Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
March 1, 2017 Filing 47 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to Integro Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
March 1, 2017 Filing 46 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
March 1, 2017 Filing 45 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to Odyssey Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
March 1, 2017 Filing 44 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. as to Sheri Pontolilo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unexecuted Summons)(Hennessy, Sarah)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint [FRCP 15(a)(3)] #33 , Defendants American International Group Inc. answer due 3/24/2017; Lexington Insurance Company answer due 3/24/2017 (mt)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #25 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #24 , for the following reasons: Case number is incorrect or missing; Title page is missing; (dro)
February 23, 2017 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant American International Group Inc.. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant Integro Ltd.. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant Odyssey Investment Partners LLC. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant E and O Professional Risk Management and Insurance Services, LLC. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 as to Defendant Sheri Pontolilo. (es)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J. Aughtman EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice #23 on behalf of Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, designating Sarah L Hennessy as local counsel. (ig)
February 23, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #25 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #24 . The following error(s) was found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Case number is incorrect or missing.Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (es)
February 23, 2017 Filing 33 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American International Group Inc. answer now due 3/23/2017; Lexington Insurance Company answer now due 3/23/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Defendants American International Group Inc.; Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint [FRCP 15(a)(3)])(Attorney Andrew J Waxler added to party American International Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J Waxler added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Waxler, Andrew)
February 23, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 23, 2017 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 25 (STRICKEN 2/23/17) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 served on 02/21/2017. (Hennessy, Sarah) Modified on 2/23/2017 (dro).
February 21, 2017 Filing 24 (STRICKEN 2/23/17) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Aughtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19394739) #23 served on 02/21/2017. (Hennessy, Sarah) Modified on 2/23/2017 (dro).
February 21, 2017 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Aughtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19394739) filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (At tachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 22 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, upon Defendant Odyssey Investment Partners LLC served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 21 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, upon Defendant Lexington Insurance Company served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 20 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, upon Defendant Integro Ltd. served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 19 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC, upon Defendant American International Group Inc. served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hennessy, Sarah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hennessy, Sarah)
January 25, 2017 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Lexington Insurance Company. (dro)
January 25, 2017 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Odyssey Investment Partners LLC. (dro)
January 25, 2017 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Integro Ltd.. (dro)
January 25, 2017 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant E and O Professional Risk Management and Insurance Services, LLC. (dro)
January 25, 2017 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant American International Group Inc.. (dro)
January 25, 2017 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Sheri Pontolilo. (dro)
January 23, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. Notice of Interested Parties (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 23, 2017 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Hennessy, Sarah)
January 20, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event. No further action is needed regarding the Civil Cover Sheet. (esa)
January 20, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 20, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
January 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19217078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Veritrust Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Attorney Sarah L Hennessy added to party Veritrust Financial, LLC(pty:pla))(Hennessy, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veritrust Financial, LLC v. Sheri Pontolilo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veritrust Financial, LLC
Represented By: Sarah L Hennessy
Represented By: Joseph H Aughtman
Represented By: Raquel A. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Pontolilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J Waxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew J Waxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E and O Professional Risk Management and Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integro Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph T Ergastolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Investment Partners LLC
Represented By: Joseph T Ergastolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?