Suzanne Napier v. Waloli Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne Napier
Defendant: WALOLI CORP., a California corporation, dba, Luvie Salon Spa & Wellness Center, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, JARIC PROPERTIES, LLC, a California limited liability company, DOES 1-10, inclusive, Waloli Corp. and Jaric Properties, LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv01621
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #17 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
November 28, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Manning, Joseph)
November 8, 2017 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. upon Jaric Properties, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/7/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Monica J Baumann, Attorney for Jaric Properties, LLC. (Manning, Joseph)
November 6, 2017 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Suzanne Napier answer now due 11/22/2017, filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier.(Manning, Joseph)
November 3, 2017 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Order to Show Cause deadline #12 previously scheduled for 11/2/2017 has been rescheduled. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/6/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2017 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Craig G. Cote re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, #12 filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Manning, Joseph)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than November 2, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (see document for details). (dro)
October 18, 2017 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier, upon Defendant Waloli Corp. served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
October 18, 2017 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier, upon Defendant Jaric Properties, LLC served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
September 25, 2017 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Jaric Properties, LLC, and Waloli Corp. (Attachments: #1 Waloli) (jtil)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 19, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 19, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
September 18, 2017 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Manning, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Manning, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier, identifying WALOLI CORP., a California corporation, dba, Luvie Salon Spa & Wellness Center; JARIC PROPERTIES, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Manning, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Manning, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20523131 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Napier. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party Suzanne Napier(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzanne Napier v. Waloli Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALOLI CORP., a California corporation, dba, Luvie Salon Spa & Wellness Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARIC PROPERTIES, LLC, a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waloli Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaric Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Napier
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?