Emma Hart v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emma Hart
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC, St. Regis Monarch Beach, Does 1 to 100, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc. and Sheraton Operating Corporation
Case Number: 8:2017cv02021
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement and Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Award by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court certifies the proposed Settlement Class, grants with exception the final approval of the Settlement Agreement, and grants with exception the motion for attorney fees and costs. (See document for further details) (es)
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Adam Rose re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #49 providing documentation of costs filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit costs)(Rose, Adam)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Minute Order Regarding Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs by Judge James V. Selna: The Court requests that Class Counsel provide itemized documentation in support of the requested $9,159.66 in costs, particularly the $3,179.66 in "travel costs for mediation" within 7 days of this order. See Rose Decl., Docket No. 44-1 17. (es)
June 17, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTES OF 1. Plaintiff Emma Hart's Motion for Final Approval #43 2. Plaintiff Emma Hart's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Class Representative Service Award #44 Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Motions are argued and taken under submission. The Court orders the case stayed pending the issuance of the ruling on these motions. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
June 17, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Chris Lawless in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of final approval of class action settlement #43 supplemental filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Rose, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Shannon Liss-Riordan in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of final approval of class action settlement #43 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs, service award, settlement administration expenses #44 filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Rose, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Adam Rose in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of final approval of class action settlement #43 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs, service award, settlement administration expenses #44 supplemental filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit time summary)(Rose, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs, service award, settlement administration expenses filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Rose, #2 Proposed Order) (Rose, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of final approval of class action settlement filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of settlement administrator, #2 Proposed Order granting final approval) (Rose, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement #36 and rules in accordance with the tentative attached. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (kt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF LODGING filed with revised Class Notice re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of class action settlement preliminary #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit revised Class Notice)(Rose, Adam)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge James V. Selna, Denying Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Motion for Preliminary Approval. (es)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamer, Alison)
February 8, 2019 Filing 38 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the MOTION for Approval of class action settlement #36 , previously scheduled for 2/11/2019 at 1:30 PM, to Thursday, 2/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Adam Rose in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of class action settlement preliminary #36 filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: settlement agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: notice to class members)(Rose, Adam)
January 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of class action settlement preliminary filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rose, Adam)
December 10, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel inform the Court that they have settled the matter in principle. The Court and counsel confer. The Court directs counsel to file the indicated motion for preliminary approval of settlement by 1/14/2019. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt)
December 7, 2018 Filing 34 First STIPULATION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at 12-10-18 Status Conference filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamer, Alison)
December 7, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emanuel M Starr counsel for Plaintiff Emma Hart. Adding Emanuel Starr as counsel of record for Emma Hart for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attorney Emanuel M Starr added to party Emma Hart(pty:pla))(Starr, Emanuel)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Status Conference or, Alternatively, to Have Permission to Appear by Phone. #31 Based on the parties Stipulation, the Status Conference currently set for November 13, 2018, has been continued to December 10, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. (es)
November 9, 2018 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from November 13, 2018 to December 10, 2018 filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamer, Alison)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Based on the parties' Stipulation #29 , the Status Conference is continued to 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM. (jp)
October 12, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Continue status conference from October 15, 2018 to November 12, 2018 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing #27 filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Adam)
September 19, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #25 filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC.(Attorney Alison Megan Hamer added to party Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC(pty:dft))(Hamer, Alison)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Based on the parties' stipulation, the scheduling conference is continued to October 15, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. (es)
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Hearing re allowing appearances by telephone for the September 10, 2018 status conference filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Adam)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC amending Amended Complaint/Petition #12 , filed by plaintiff Emma Hart(Rose, Adam)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit second amended complaint)(Rose, Adam)
August 3, 2018 Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference, previously set for 8/6/2018 at 10:30 AM, to MONDAY, 9/10/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. If the indicated motion is filed prior to 9/10/18 the Scheduling Conference will be vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT for scheduling conference filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. (Rose, Adam)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Stipulation for Protective Order #20 . (jdo)
May 23, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation.(Hamer, Alison)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation to Continue #18 . The new deadline for the motion for class certification is September 14, 2018. Formal discovery is stayed until June 14, 2018. The Scheduling Conference set for April 16, 2018 is continued to August 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.) (twdb)
April 13, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue deadline for motion for class certification, and scheduling conference from the current deadline for class certification - May 9, 2018, and the scheduling conference on April 16, 2018 to new deadline for motion for class certification - September 14, 2018, and the scheduling conference to July 30, 2018 filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Adam)
April 9, 2018 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-7 days, filed by Defendant Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC.. (Hamer, Alison)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Continue Motion for Class Certification #15 by Judge James V. Selna: Based on the parties' stipulation, the new deadline for the motion for class certification is May 9, 2018. Formal discovery is stayed in the interim. (lwag)
February 9, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Continue deadline for motion for class certification from February 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018 filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Adam)
January 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Emma Hart. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition #12 caption (Rose, Adam) Modified on 1/16/2018 (twdb). (DEFENDANTS NAME CORRECTED 1/16/18) RE STARWOOD HOTELS AND RESORTS WORLDWIDE, LLC.
January 10, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation.(Hamer, Alison)
December 27, 2017 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Emma Hart(Rose, Adam)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/9/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen)
December 15, 2017 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
December 13, 2017 Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having reviewed the Amended Notice of Removal #8 , ORDERS the Order to Show Cause #7 DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 11, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Sheraton Operating Corporation, St. Regis Monarch Beach. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Spiegeland)(Muller, Kirstin)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge James V. Selna: Marriot is ordered to file an amended initial pleading within 15 days identifying each member of Mars and the members citizenship and principal place of business as the date of the filing of the initial pleading. If any member is itself an LLC, the same information shall be provided for each subtier member, and if need be, for each successive subtier. (See Order for further details.) (es)
November 22, 2017 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC answer now due 12/27/2017; Sheraton Operating Corporation answer now due 12/27/2017; Marriott International, Inc. answer now due 12/27/2017, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC; Sheraton Operating Corporation; Marriott International, Inc..(Hamer, Alison)
November 17, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 17, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
November 17, 2017 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Emma Hart, upon Defendant Sheraton Operating Corporation served on 10/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
November 17, 2017 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 to 100, Marriott International, Inc., Sheraton Operating Corporation, St. Regis Monarch Beach, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., filed by plaintiff Emma Hart. (esa)
November 17, 2017 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, (Muller, Kirstin)
November 17, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Sheraton Operating Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Muller, Kirstin)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017-00949432-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: 0973-20846722 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Sheraton Operating Corporation, Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Spiegeland, #2 Declaration Benjamin Treger, #3 Complaint) (Attorney Kirstin E Muller added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstin E Muller added to party Sheraton Operating Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstin E Muller added to party Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft))(Muller, Kirstin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emma Hart v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J Treger
Represented By: Reed E Schaper
Represented By: Alison Megan Hamer
Represented By: Kirstin E Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Treger
Represented By: Reed E Schaper
Represented By: Alison Megan Hamer
Represented By: Kirstin E Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Regis Monarch Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Operating Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin J Treger
Represented By: Reed E Schaper
Represented By: Alison Megan Hamer
Represented By: Kirstin E Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Hart
Represented By: Theodore Richard Tang
Represented By: Robert L Starr
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Emanuel M Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?