Hoang Trinh et al v. Thomas D. Homan et al Featured Case

A class action lawsuit against U.S. officials, alleging that the federal government is illegally detaining dozens of Vietnamese immigrants for indefinite periods of time.

Petitioner: Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen and Hoang Trinh
Respondent: Thomas D Homan, Sandra Hutchens, David Marin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B Sessions III and Warden
Case Number: 8:2018cv00316
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J. Carney
Presiding Judge: Gail J. Standish
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34), 13 The Notice to Counsel from Clerk portion of the transfer order did not reflect the correct magistrate judge for the reassignment of the case. The Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 18-00316 CJC (GJS). (mca)
March 1, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hans Chen counsel for Respondents Thomas D Homan, Sandra Hutchens, David Marin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B Sessions III, Warden. Adding Hans H. Chen as counsel of record for Thomas D. Homan, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents Thomas D. Homan, et al.. (Attorney Hans Chen added to party Thomas D Homan(pty:res), Attorney Hans Chen added to party Sandra Hutchens(pty:res), Attorney Hans Chen added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Hans Chen added to party Kirstjen M. Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Hans Chen added to party Jefferson B Sessions III(pty:res), Attorney Hans Chen added to party Warden(pty:res))(Chen, Hans)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV17-01898 CJC (GJSx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-00316 CJC (PLA). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (lwag)
February 27, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, 1 as to Defendant Sandra Hutchens. (sbou)
February 27, 2018 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, 1 as to Defendants Thomas D Homan, David Marin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B Sessions III, Warden. (sbou)
February 26, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Summons Request, 5 , Notice of Related Case(s) 4 filed by Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. (Uong, Tuan)
February 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, 5 . The following error(s) was found: Do not put "et al" on the summons caption.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
February 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
February 23, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jesse A. Davis III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21303682) filed by PLAINTIFFS Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoan g, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hoq, Laboni)
February 23, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phi U. Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21303626) filed by PLAINTIFFS Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Lo ng Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Laboni A Hoq added to party Vu Ha(pty:pet), Attorney Laboni A Hoq added to party Ngoc Hoang(pty:pet), Attorney Laboni A Hoq added to party Long Nguyen(pty:pet), Attorney Laboni A Hoq added to party Hoang Trinh(pty:pet)) (Hoq, Laboni)
February 22, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Notice of Related Case(s) 4 filed by Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. (Uong, Tuan)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01898-CJC (GJSx) (Uong, Tuan)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh, identifying none known. (Uong, Tuan)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioners Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Long Nguyen, Hoang Trinh. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Uong, Tuan)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-21303112 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioners Long Nguyen, Vu Ha, Ngoc Hoang, Hoang Trinh. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A to Habeas Corpus Class Action Petition And Class Action Complaint For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief) (Attorney Tuan Van Uong added to party Vu Ha(pty:pet), Attorney Tuan Van Uong added to party Ngoc Hoang(pty:pet), Attorney Tuan Van Uong added to party Long Nguyen(pty:pet), Attorney Tuan Van Uong added to party Hoang Trinh(pty:pet))(Uong, Tuan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoang Trinh et al v. Thomas D. Homan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vu Ha
Represented By: Christopher M Butler
Represented By: Raymond A Cardozo
Represented By: Jesse A Davis
Represented By: Patil Derderian
Represented By: Laboni A Hoq
Represented By: Winifred V Kao
Represented By: Melanie Chun-Yu Kim
Represented By: Christopher M Lapinig
Represented By: Kevin Chun Hoi Lo
Represented By: Phi U Nguyen
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ngoc Hoang
Represented By: Christopher M Butler
Represented By: Raymond A Cardozo
Represented By: Jesse A Davis
Represented By: Patil Derderian
Represented By: Laboni A Hoq
Represented By: Winifred V Kao
Represented By: Melanie Chun-Yu Kim
Represented By: Christopher M Lapinig
Represented By: Kevin Chun Hoi Lo
Represented By: Phi U Nguyen
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Long Nguyen
Represented By: Christopher M Butler
Represented By: Raymond A Cardozo
Represented By: Jesse A Davis
Represented By: Patil Derderian
Represented By: Laboni A Hoq
Represented By: Winifred V Kao
Represented By: Melanie Chun-Yu Kim
Represented By: Christopher M Lapinig
Represented By: Kevin Chun Hoi Lo
Represented By: Phi U Nguyen
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hoang Trinh
Represented By: Christopher M Butler
Represented By: Raymond A Cardozo
Represented By: Jesse A Davis
Represented By: Patil Derderian
Represented By: Laboni A Hoq
Represented By: Winifred V Kao
Represented By: Melanie Chun-Yu Kim
Represented By: Christopher M Lapinig
Represented By: Kevin Chun Hoi Lo
Represented By: Phi U Nguyen
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas D Homan
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandra Hutchens
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B Sessions III
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Hans Chen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?