Banc of California, National Association et al v. Mary Carole McDonnell et al
Plaintiff: Banc of California, National Association
Defendant: Dion Noravian, Melvin Clark Jr., Mary Carole McDonnell, Northern Trust Corporation, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Merchants Bonding Company Mutual
Petitioner: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Case Number: 8:2018cv01194
Filed: July 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/5/18 re Transcript #83 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Baird, Miriam) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2019 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/5/18. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miriam Baird, phone number mvb11893@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2019. (Baird, Miriam)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION (DKT. NO. #78 ) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Defendant Northern Trust Corporation filed an ex parte application (Dkt. No. 78) to vacate Plaintiff Banc of California's ("BOC") notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice (Dkt. No. 75). Defendant Melvin Clark joined the ex parte application. (Dkt. No. 79.) The Court DENIES Defendants' joint ex parte application. (SEE ATTACHED) (es)
December 20, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #80 (Zipser, Dean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice #78 PLAINTIFF BANC OF CALIFORNIA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Zipser, Dean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 79 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice #78 filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. (Williams, Marc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 78 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amanda S. Amert, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Order) (Martin, Craig)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS DION NORAVIAN AND MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY (MUTUAL) WITHOUT PREJUDICE #76 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, it is hereby ORDERED pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that Noravian and Merchants are dismissed from the above-entitled action without prejudice. (Merchants Bonding Company Mutual and Dion Noravian (an individual) terminated.) (es)
December 19, 2018 Filing 76 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, Dion Noravian filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zipser, Dean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Melvin Clark Jr., Mary Carole McDonnell, Northern Trust Corporation. (Zipser, Dean)
December 11, 2018 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Jared Meiselas counsel for Defendant Dion Noravian. ERIC Y. HAHN is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT DION NORAVIAN. (Meiselas, Benjamin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Jared Meiselas counsel for Defendant Dion Noravian. Adding MALLORY WHITELAW as counsel of record for DION NORAVIAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT DION NORAVIAN. (Meiselas, Benjamin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 72 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Zipser, Dean)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION #65 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: This matter is appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). The Court therefore VACATES the December 10, 2018 hearing. (es)
November 29, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to for Order #65 DEFENDANT MELVIN CLARKS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ALTERNATIVE SERVICE filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. (Williams, Marc)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REPSOND THERETO #68 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. 1. Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association shall file its amended complaint by December 7, 2018; and 2. Defendants' responses to the amended complaint will be due by January 8, 2019. (es)
November 27, 2018 Filing 68 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reagan, Carole)
November 19, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to for Order #65 - DEFENDANT NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATION'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ALTERNATIVE SERVICE filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Martin, Craig)
November 9, 2018 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY PUBLICATION OR OTHER REASONABLE MEANS filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Reagan, Carole)
November 9, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY PUBLICATION OR OTHER REASONABLE MEANS filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas Umberg, #2 Declaration Otis Crawford, #3 Declaration Humberto Palacio, #4 Declaration Alexa Mojica, #5 Proposed Order)(Reagan, Carole) Modified on 11/13/2018 (es).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 21 days of this Order. (es)
November 5, 2018 Filing 63 MINUTES OF 1. DEFENDANT NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT [DKT #53 ] 2. MOTION OF DEFENDANT MELVIN CLARK JR TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) [DKT #54 ] Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Matters are argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: For reasons of calendar management and judicial economy, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on the pending motions to dismiss, currently set for October 29, 2018 to November 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Dkt. Nos. #53 and #54 .) (es)
October 15, 2018 Filing 61 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims for Relief Against Defendant Melvin Clark Jr. #54 filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. (Williams, Marc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Northern Trust Corporation #53 filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Martin, Craig)
October 5, 2018 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Northern Trust Corporation #53 BANC OF CALIFORNIA'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Reagan, Carole)
October 5, 2018 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims for Relief Against Defendant Melvin Clark Jr. #54 BANC OF CALIFORNIA'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEL CLARK'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Reagan, Carole)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 11/18/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 8:30 am Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 9:00 am. (gga)
October 1, 2018 Filing 56 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 11/18/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (gga)
September 24, 2018 Filing 55 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Early Meeting Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) and Court's Scheduling Order ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association.. (Zipser, Dean)
September 19, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims for Relief Against Defendant Melvin Clark Jr. filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Marc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Northern Trust Corporation filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Martin, Craig)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #50 Non-Resident Attorney Craig C. Martin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation, designating Brandon Fox as local counsel. (es)
September 5, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22363341) #50 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom)
September 4, 2018 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22363341) filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fox, Brandon)
August 31, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #46 was replaced to reflect the Application was GRANTED. (es)
August 30, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation, (Fox, Brandon)
August 29, 2018 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation (Fox, Brandon)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #44 Non-Resident Attorney Alexis E. Bates APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation, designating Brandon Fox as local counsel. (es) (Main Document 46 replaced on 8/31/2018) (es).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #43 Non-Resident Attorney Amanda S. Amert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation, designating Brandon Fox as local counsel. (es)
August 28, 2018 Filing 44 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexis E. Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22331789) filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fox, Brandon)
August 28, 2018 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Amanda S. Amert Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. 0973-22331753 for $400 pro hac vice fee. (Fox, Brandon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda S. Amert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Northern Trust Corporation (PHV fee of $400 paid.) filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fox, Brandon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brandon D Fox counsel for Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. Adding Brandon Fox as counsel of record for Northern Trust Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (Attorney Brandon D Fox added to party Northern Trust Corporation(pty:dft))(Fox, Brandon)
August 16, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual.(Benbow, Shannon)
August 16, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text: missing name of event and docket text content In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 16, 2018 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual identifying Merchants Bonding Company as Corporate Parent. (Benbow, Shannon)
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #37 , Notice of Appearance #36 served on 8/16/18. (Benbow, Shannon)
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, (Benbow, Shannon)
August 16, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shannon M Benbow on behalf of Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual (Attorney Shannon M Benbow added to party Merchants Bonding Company Mutual(pty:dft))(Benbow, Shannon)
August 15, 2018 Filing 35 (Sargizian, Mikouya)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2018 at 9:00 am. (lb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV18-01194 AG (ADSx). (lwag)
August 7, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual.(Attorney Mikouya Sargizian added to party Merchants Bonding Company Mutual(pty:dft))(Sargizian, Mikouya)
August 6, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Melvin Clark Jr. answer now due 9/19/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr..(Williams, Marc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer M Resnik counsel for Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. Adding Jennifer M. Resnik as counsel of record for Melvin Clark Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. (Attorney Jennifer M Resnik added to party Melvin Clark Jr.(pty:dft))(Resnik, Jennifer)
August 2, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc S Williams counsel for Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. Adding Marc S. Williams as counsel of record for Melvin Clark Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Melvin Clark Jr.. (Attorney Marc S Williams added to party Melvin Clark Jr.(pty:dft))(Williams, Marc)
August 2, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dion Noravian, (Meiselas, Benjamin)
August 2, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every party's first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Dion Noravian.(Attorney Benjamin Jared Meiselas added to party Dion Noravian(pty:dft))(Meiselas, Benjamin)
July 30, 2018 Filing 24 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association, upon Defendant Melvin Clark Jr. served on 7/22/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zipser, Dean)
July 16, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. upon Northern Trust Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/13/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Brandon D. Fox. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 13, 2018 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dion Noravian. (jp)
July 13, 2018 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Merchants Bonding Company Mutual. (jp)
July 13, 2018 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mary Carole McDonnell. (jp)
July 13, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Melvin Clark Jr. (jp)
July 13, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Northern Trust Corporation. (jp)
July 12, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Requests #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 and #11 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
July 11, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association, identifying Banc of California, National Association; Banc of California, Inc.; Mary Carole McDonnell; Dion Noravian; Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual); Northern Trust Corporation; Melvin Clark Jr.. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 6, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association identifying Banc of California, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Umberg, Thomas)
July 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22050206 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Attorney Thomas J Umberg added to party Banc of California, National Association(pty:pla))(Umberg, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banc of California, National Association et al v. Mary Carole McDonnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Noravian
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Marcus A Petoyan
Represented By: Eric Y Hahn
Represented By: Mallory Whitelaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Clark Jr.
Represented By: Marc S Williams
Represented By: Jennifer M Resnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carole McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Trust Corporation
Represented By: Brandon D Fox
Represented By: Alexis E Bates
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company Mutual
Represented By: Shannon M Benbow
Represented By: Mikouya Sargizian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banc of California, National Association
Represented By: Thomas J Umberg
Represented By: Robert S McWhorter
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Jacqueline N Vu
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?