United States of America v. E. Avico, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. dba ERC Roofing and Waterproofing and Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: E. Avico, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Klondike Construction Services, Inc. and Moes
Cross Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 8:2018cv01243
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: David O Carter
1 Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff E. Avico, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant Klondike Construction Services, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorena Doe, Agent for Klondike Construction Services, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Swinford, Sean)
August 27, 2018 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant E. Avico, Inc., identifying United States of America, James River Insurance Company, Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc., and Klondike Construction Services, Inc.. (Swinford, Sean)
August 20, 2018 23 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Third Party Complaint #18 as to Third party defendant Klondike Construction Services, Inc. (twdb)
August 20, 2018 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Crossclaim, #18 as to Cross Defendant Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. (twdb)
August 20, 2018 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 17, 2018 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim, #18 filed by Third Party Plaintiff E. Avico, Inc.. (Swinford, Sean)
August 17, 2018 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim, #18 filed by Cross Claimant E. Avico, Inc.. (Swinford, Sean)
August 17, 2018 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMANDAmended, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Klondike Construction Services, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. filed by Defendant E. Avico, Inc..(Swinford, Sean)
August 15, 2018 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/17/18. Please review the Notice of Deficiencies #15 #16 and refile 8/17/18 (twdb)
August 15, 2018 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim #13 . he following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. A summons request should be made with a separate docket entry. The Summons does not indicate whether or not the summons is for the cross complaint or the third party complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
August 15, 2018 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Third Party Complaint, Cross claim, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: The answer includes a Cross Claim and Third Party Complaint. The caption should indicate Cross Claimant v. Cross Defendant; There should also be a caption for the Third party complaint. It should indicate Third party Plaintiff v. Third party defendant. Please make sure that you are properly naming the parties in regards to the Cross claim and the third party complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 15, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 14, 2018 13 STRICKEN PER #17: ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Klondike Construction Services, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. filed by Defendant/Crossclaimant E. Avico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons, #2 Request for Summons)(Attorney Sean Merritt Swinford added to party E. Avico, Inc.(pty:dft))(Swinford, Sean) Modified on 8/16/2018 (twdb).
August 7, 2018 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Schmall, Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Park, Grace)
August 6, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant E. Avico, Inc. served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leeor Arshadnia, Person in Charge at the Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Park, Grace)
August 6, 2018 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. answer now due 9/14/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Park, Grace)
July 17, 2018 9 Featured Case INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 17, 2018 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant E. Avico, Inc. (car)
July 17, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. (car)
July 17, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
July 16, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Park, Grace)
July 16, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Park, Grace)
July 16, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Park, Grace)
July 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Grace Y Park added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Park, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. E. Avico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: E. Avico, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Merritt Swinford
Represented By: Justin G Reden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc. dba ERC Roofing and Waterproofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Waterproofing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Charles Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Grace Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Klondike Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Moes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?