James River Insurance Company v. Tae J. Song DPM et al
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Defendant: Russell Witherspoon, Tae J. Song DPM, Inc., Tae J Song, Russell H. Witherspoon and Tae J. Song DPM
Case Number: 8:2018cv01385
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Russell H. Witherspoon answer now due 10/25/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 filed by plaintiff James River Insurance Company.(Hafey, Matthew)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company, upon Defendant Russell H. Witherspoon served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Russell Witherspoon in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tae J. Song DPM. (es)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tae J. Song DPM, Inc.. (es)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Russell H. Witherspoon. (es)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company, identifying James River Group Holdings, Ltd.; James River Group Inc.. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Hafey, Matthew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22215457 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Policy) (Attorney Matthew J Hafey added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Hafey, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James River Insurance Company v. Tae J. Song DPM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae J. Song DPM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae J Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell H. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae J. Song DPM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Hafey
Represented By: Donna Victoria Louise LaBrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?