Melanie Spencer v. RSM Automotive LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Melanie Spencer
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and RSM Automotive, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv01437
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
1 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having received and reviewed the Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 , ORDERS the Order to Show Cause #17 DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, a Division of Capital One, N.A.'s Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. #19 Capital One shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before November 14, 2018. (es)
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., identifying Capital One Auto Finance, A Division of Capital One, N.A.; Capital One Financial Corporation; Melanie Spencer; RSM Automotive LLC; and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Eley, Hunter)
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 14, 2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #18 filed by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, a Division of Capital One, N.A.'s Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Attorney Hunter R Eley added to party Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.(pty:dft))(Eley, Hunter)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subject Sale Contract, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Venue Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Toyota Extended Service Contract, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Portfolio Protection Extended Service Contract, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Welcome letter from Toyota Extra Care)(Hartsock, Monica)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Jurisdiction by Judge James V. Selna: Spencer is ordered to file an amended initial pleading within 15 days identifying each member of each alleged LLC and the members citizenship and principal place of business as the date of the filing of the initial pleading. If any member is itself an LLC, the same information shall be provided for each subtier member, and if need be, for each successive subtier. (See order for additional information.) (es)
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (es)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (es)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant RSM Automotive, LLC. (es)
August 14, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The first named defendant has to be written in before referring to the attachment. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer, (Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hartsock, Monica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22252478 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Melanie Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sale Contract, #2 Exhibit Venue Declaration, #3 Exhibit Extended Service Contract, #4 Exhibit Extended Service Contract) (Attorney Monica Lea Hartsock added to party Melanie Spencer(pty:bkmov))(Hartsock, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melanie Spencer v. RSM Automotive LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter R Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Spencer
Represented By: Monica Lea Hartsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?