Andrew J. Lazur v. Marion Blakey et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Lazur
Defendant: Marion Blakey, DOES I through X, inclusive, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc. and Rolls-Royce North America Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv01472
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #15 . Defendants Marion Blakey answer due 10/26/2018; Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc. answer due 10/26/2018; Rolls-Royce North America Inc. answer due 10/26/2018. (twdb)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 26, 2018 filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moberg, Marilyn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur.. (Crosby, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur, identifying Andrew J. Lazur, Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce North America Inc., Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc.. (Crosby, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #10 served on 08/24/2018. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., Marion Blakey.(Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur, upon Defendant Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/19/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marilyn A. Moberg, Counsel. (Filed in state court 7/20/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 11) (esa)
August 20, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur, upon Defendant Rolls-Royce North America Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/19/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marilyn A. Moberg, Counsel. (Filed in state court 7/20/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 10) (esa)
August 20, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur, upon Defendant Marion Blakey acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/19/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marilyn A. Moberg, Counsel. (Filed in state court 7/20/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 9) (esa)
August 20, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Marion Blakey, Does I through X, inclusive, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Andrew J. Lazur. (Filed in state court 2/28/28, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , Jury Demand #6 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 served on 08/20/2018. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc... (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc.) filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc. identifying Rolls-Royce North America Inc., which is wholly-owned by Rolls-Royce North America Holdings Inc., which is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of Rolls-Royce Group plc as Corporate Parent. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Rolls-Royce North America Inc.) filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc. identifying Rolls-Royce North America Holdings Inc., which is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of Rolls-Royce Group plc as Corporate Parent. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice/ CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., identifying Rolls-Royce North America Holdings Inc.; Rolls-Royce plc. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marion Blakey, Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc.. (Moberg, Marilyn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 30-2018-00976404-CU-DF-CJC Receipt No: 0973-22282066 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc., Rolls-Royce North America Inc., Marion Blakey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Case Assigned to Judicial Officer, #5 Exhibit A - CMC Scheduled, #6 Exhibit A - CMC Statement filed 05182018, #7 Exhibit A - Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #8 Exhibit A - Minutes of 06112018, #9 Exhibit A - Blakey Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt, #10 Exhibit A - RRNA Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt, #11 Exhibit A - RRHTC Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt, #12 Exhibit A - CMC Statement filed 07202018, #13 Exhibit A - MInutes of 07232018) (Attorney Marilyn A Moberg added to party Marion Blakey(pty:dft), Attorney Marilyn A Moberg added to party Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marilyn A Moberg added to party Rolls-Royce North America Inc.(pty:dft))(Moberg, Marilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew J. Lazur v. Marion Blakey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Blakey
Represented By: Marilyn A Moberg
Represented By: Brian Patrick Cadigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I through X, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce High Temperature Composites Inc.
Represented By: Marilyn A Moberg
Represented By: Brian Patrick Cadigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce North America Inc.
Represented By: Marilyn A Moberg
Represented By: Brian Patrick Cadigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Lazur
Represented By: William M Crosby
Represented By: George B Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?