Darrell Hallett v. St Liberty, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Hallett
Defendant: Alan Swimmer, St Liberty, LLC and G. Robert Toney
Case Number: 8:2018cv01491
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #17 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (twdb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Darrell Hallett. (twdb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Darrell Hallett(twdb)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #12 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court GRANTS AS UNOPPOSED Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint in its entirety. If Plaintiff so chooses, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before October 9, 2018. Plaintiff is hereby warned that another failure to oppose any future motions to dismiss will result in dismissal of Plaintiffs claims with prejudice. Moreover, Plaintiff is admonished to follow all the Local Rules and to timely prosecute this case. (lom)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY In Support of a Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney. (Cefalu, Marc)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 [Proposed] Order) (Cefalu, Marc)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on 08/28/18. (Cefalu, Marc)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV18-00096 DOC (JDEx). Case transferred from Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-01491 DOC (JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (lwag)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-00096-DOC-JDEx (Cefalu, Marc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 3 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
August 22, 2018 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Darrell Hallett, upon Defendant Alan Swimmer acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/3/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marc T Cefalu, Attorney for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2018 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Darrell Hallett, upon Defendant St Liberty LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/3/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marc T Cefalu, Attorney for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2018 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Darrell Hallett, upon Defendant G. Robert Toney acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/3/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marc T Cefalu, Attorney for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2018 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Darrell Hallett. Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on 8/22/18. (Cefalu, Marc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants St Liberty, LLC, Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney. (Cefalu, Marc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Cefalu, Marc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2018-01003044 Receipt No: 0973-22297172 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Alan Swimmer, G. Robert Toney, St Liberty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Marc T Cefalu added to party St Liberty, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marc T Cefalu added to party Alan Swimmer(pty:dft), Attorney Marc T Cefalu added to party G. Robert Toney(pty:dft))(Cefalu, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrell Hallett v. St Liberty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Swimmer
Represented By: Marc T Cefalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Liberty, LLC
Represented By: Marc T Cefalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Robert Toney
Represented By: Marc T Cefalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Hallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?