Robert Rollins v. The Fishing Vessel Provider OVN 572344
Plaintiff: Robert Rollins
Defendant: More Carnage and The Fishing Vessel Provider OVN 572344
Case Number: 8:2018cv01573
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John R Hillsman counsel for Plaintiff Robert Rollins. Abraham Feinstein Hillsman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff plaintiff. (Hillsman, John)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER GRANTING Request to Hold Service of Process in Abeyance #9 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a report concerning the status of this case by no later than 12/3/2018. The Court ORDERS that this matter be set for a status conference on 12/10/2018 at 9:00 AM. Should counsel wish to continue the December 10 status conference, they may include such a request in the status report. (jp)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Written Request to Hold Service of Process in Abeyance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Hold Service of Process In Abeyance)(Hillsman, John)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Fishing Vessel Provider OVN 572344. (ghap)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Robert Rollins. Related Case(s): BC634118 Los Angeles Superior Court (Hillsman, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Robert Rollins, identifying More Carnage LLC, International Marine Underwriters. (Hillsman, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Robert Rollins. (Hillsman, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Rollins. (Hillsman, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22364330 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Robert Rollins. (Attorney John R Hillsman added to party Robert Rollins(pty:pla))(Hillsman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Rollins v. The Fishing Vessel Provider OVN 572344
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rollins
Represented By: John R Hillsman
Represented By: Lia T Marks
Represented By: Abraham Feinstein Hillsman
Represented By: Lyle C Cavin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: More Carnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fishing Vessel Provider OVN 572344
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?