Nehemiah Kong v. Mana Investment Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Mana Investment Company, LLC, Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv01615
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mana Investment Company, LLC, (Miskabi, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Mana Investment Company, LLC.(Miskabi, Joseph)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 12-01.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cathy L Arias counsel for Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Adding Cathy L. Arias as counsel of record for Starbucks Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attorney Cathy L Arias added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Arias, Cathy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation identifying Starbucks Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Zong, Julie)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Julie Yin Zong added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Zong, Julie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mana Investment Company, LLC, (Miskabi, Joseph)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mana Investment Company, LLC answer now due 11/9/2018, filed by Defendant Mana Investment Company, LLC.(Attorney Joseph Miskabi added to party Mana Investment Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Miskabi, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY(Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Mana Investment Company, LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: JACK NASSIM MUSSRY in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (gga)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Mana Investment Company, LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (car)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintif Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22397734 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Mana Investment Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mana Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Miskabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Julie Yin Zong
Represented By: Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Cathy L Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?