Compass Bank v. Igor Shabanets et al
Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Defendant: Olga Shabanets and Igor Shabanets
Case Number: 8:2018cv01773
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. As of the date of this Order, Plaintiff has not filed a proof of service or otherwise responded to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:18-cv-01773 JFW (FFMx). (esa)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS): Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. On or before June 24, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve Defendants. (sbou)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order re Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is hereby granted additional time until June 3, 2019, in which to serve Defendants. (See document for details.) (sbou)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION /Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants filed by Plaintiff Compass Bank. (Escovedo, Joshua)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS): Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, on or before April 29, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve Defendants. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY SERVE DEFENDANTS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT.) IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is hereby granted an additional 90 days, to April 17, 2019, in which to serve Defendants. re #8 . (sbou)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Compass Bank to Court's Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Time Serve Defendants)(Escovedo, Joshua)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (IN CHAMBERS): Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, on or before January 17, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve Defendants. (See document.) (sbou)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Igor Shabanets, Olga Shabanets. (sbou)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Compass Bank. (Escovedo, Joshua)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Compass Bank, identifying BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. and Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Escovedo, Joshua)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1 Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11- Statement of Consent) (et)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22504478 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Compass Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Joshua Heath Escovedo added to party Compass Bank(pty:pla))(Escovedo, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compass Bank v. Igor Shabanets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Shabanets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Shabanets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Represented By: Joshua Heath Escovedo
Represented By: Zachary S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?