J. R. N. et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Pablo Ramirez, Erika Novoa and J. R. N.
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: Jennifer Ramirez Novoa
Case Number: 8:2018cv01794
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John D Early
1 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV17-01878 AG (JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-01794 AG (JDEx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lwag)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant United States of America. correcting Notice of Related Case(s) #19 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Related Cases, #2 Exhibit A)(Beck, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United States of America. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01878-AG-JDE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beck, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Beck counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Daniel A. Beck as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J. R. N., Pablo Ramirez, Erika Novoa, upon Defendant United States of America served on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Neill, Sean)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #12 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Erika Novoa as Guardian ad Litem for J.R.N. (sbou)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (es)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs J. R. N., Erika Novoa, Pablo Ramirez, (O'Neill, Sean)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST for Appointment of Erika Novoa as Guardian ad Litem for JRN filed by Plaintiffs J. R. N., Erika Novoa, Pablo Ramirez. (O'Neill, Sean)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs J. R. N., Erika Novoa, Pablo Ramirez. correcting Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,,, #7 (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(O'Neill, Sean)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs J. R. N., Erika Novoa, Pablo Ramirez. (O'Neill, Sean)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 2 Civil Cover Sheet are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Wrong name of court please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by JRN Jennifer Ramirez Novoa. (O'Neill, Sean)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 10/03/2018, receipt number 26CLN3PU).(O'Neill, Sean)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22525803 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Sean Patrick O'Neill added to party Jennifer Ramirez Novoa(pty:bkmov))(O'Neill, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. R. N. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Ramirez
Represented By: Carl A McMahan
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Novoa
Represented By: Carl A McMahan
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R. N.
Represented By: Carl A McMahan
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer Ramirez Novoa
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?