Nehemiah Kong v. Mohamed Khouraki et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Mohamed Khouraki, Noha Khouraki, Al Tayebat Market, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2018cv01832
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John D Early
1 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 15 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES (gga)
November 26, 2018 14 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held: Discovery cut-off 4/25/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2019 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (gga)
November 14, 2018 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Attorney Omar Ahmed Siddiqui added to party Mohamed Khouraki(pty:dft), Attorney Omar Ahmed Siddiqui added to party Noha Khouraki(pty:dft), Attorney Omar Ahmed Siddiqui added to party Mohamed Khouraki(pty:dft), Attorney Omar Ahmed Siddiqui added to party Noha Khouraki(pty:dft))(Siddiqui, Omar)
November 14, 2018 12 Joint APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants Al Tayebat Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation) (Attorney Omar Ahmed Siddiqui added to party Al Tayebat Market, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Siddiqui, Omar)
November 8, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Noha Khouraki served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Samar Khouraki - Store Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Mohamed Khouraki served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Samar Khouraki - Store Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Al Tayebat Market, Inc. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Samar Khouraki - Store Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 25, 2018 8 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on November 26, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (es)
October 16, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Al Tayebat Market, Inc., Mohamed Khouraki, Noha Khouraki. (jp)
October 16, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
October 16, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jp)
October 12, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22565029 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Mohamed Khouraki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Khouraki
Represented By: Omar Ahmed Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noha Khouraki
Represented By: Omar Ahmed Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Tayebat Market, Inc.
Represented By: Omar Ahmed Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?