Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company Ltd. v. Crestwood Pacific LLC

Plaintiff: Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD
Defendant: Crestwood Pacific LLC and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2018cv01872
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Text Only Order DENYING First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply/Opposition Relief Ex Parte Appication for an Order Granting Defendant Crestwood Leave to File Sur-Reply and Deem Original Crestwood Response in Opposition to Nevis Island, Comprehensive Coordina #21 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply/Opposition Relief Ex Parte Appication for an Order Granting Defendant Crestwood Leave to File Sur-Reply and Deem Original Crestwood Response in Opposition to Nevis Island, Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company, LTD's Motion to Remand to have been Accepted by the Court NUNC PRO TUNC filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joe R. Correa in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Declaration of Joe R. Correa, #3 Response to CCICL Evidentiary Objections, #4 Proposed Sur-Reply, #5 Proposed Order) (Correa, Jose)
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 12/10/2018 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related) #14 PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JOE R. CORREA IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND [DKT. NO. 14] filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Max)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related) #14 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #16 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #15 , Response in Opposition to Motion #13 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO, AND REQUEST TO STRIKE, DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED PAPERS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND [DKT. NOS. 13, 14, 15, 16]; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-13 AND 83-7 filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Max)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration (Motion related) #14 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #16 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #15 , Response in Opposition to Motion #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Correct case number is SACV18-1872-DOC-KES. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 [Proposed] Order on Motion to Remand Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Correa, Jose)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 with Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Correa, Jose)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Joe R. Correa in Support of Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Correa, Jose)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Correa, Jose)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD, identifying Darby Brown, Owner. (Rothman, Max)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Max L. Rothman in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Rothman, Max)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothman, Max)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Notice of Interested Parties) filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC (Correa, Jose)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
October 18, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company Ltd., in Orange County Superior Court on 8/29/2018, attached as Exhibit NN. (jtil)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Correa, Jose)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 30-2017-000940799-CU-NP-CJC with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 10/18/2018, receipt number 0973-22598170), filed by defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Correa, Jose)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 30-2017-000940799-CU-NP-CJC Receipt No: 0973-22598170 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Crestwood Pacific LLC. (Attorney Jose R Correa added to party Crestwood Pacific LLC(pty:dft))(Correa, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company Ltd. v. Crestwood Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestwood Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jose R Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Coordinated Insurance Company LTD
Represented By: Max Loren Rothman
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?