Vivian Grijalva, et al v. Kevin Mason, P.A., et al
Plaintiff: Evan Wendt, Vivian Grijalva, Erinn Sudol, Jasmine Young, Jennifer Ackerman, Jaime Sweat and Elizabeth Ripoli
Defendant: National Legal Staffing Support, LLC, Reliant Account Management (RAM) Servicing, Inc., Kevin Mason, P.A., GM Law Firm, LLC, Julie Queler, Gregory Fishman, Benjamin Zuckerman, Chantel L Grant, Berger Singerman, LLP, Daszkal Bolton, LLP, Kevin P Mason, Resolvy, LLC, John Doe, XYZ Business Entity Defendants, Jane Doe, Kevin P. Mason, Chantel L. Grant and Reliant Account Management RAM, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02010
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs and Class Representatives Evan Wendt, Vivian Grijalva, Jasmine Young, Erinn Sudol, Jaime Sweat, Jennifer Ackerman, Elizabeth Ripoli (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Je'henna Williamson, #2 Exhibit Vivian Grijalva POA w/ Kevin Mason, #3 Exhibit Vivian Grijalva POA w/ GM Law Firm, #4 Exhibit CFPB Advisory (1), #5 Exhibit CFPB Consumer Advisory (2), #6 Exhibit Vivian Grijalva State Court Summons, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 (Part 1) Evan Wendt POA w/ Kevin Mason, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 (Part 2), #9 Exhibit Evan Wendt POA w/ GM Law Firm, #10 Exhibit Evan Wendt Narrative Synopsis, #11 Exhibit Evan Wendt NLSS Call Transcript, #12 Exhibit Evan Wendt State Court Summons, #13 Exhibit Evan Wendt-RAM Agreement, #14 Exhibit Jasmine Young POA w/ Kevin Mason, #15 Exhibit Jasmine Young NLSS/RAM Payment History, #16 Exhibit Jasmine Young Collection Letters, #17 Exhibit Jasmine Young POA w/ GM Law Firm, #18 Exhibit Erinn Sudol POA w/ Kevin Mason, #19 Exhibit Erinn Sudol-RAM Agreement, #20 Exhibit Florida Bar Bulletin, #21 Exhibit Kevin Mason Marketing Slideshow, #22 Exhibit Welcome to the Program Marketing Materials, #23 Exhibit RAM Intake Paperwork for NLSS Payment-Processing Account, #24 Exhibit RAM/NLSS/Resolvly Account Authorization Agreement)(Attorney Macy D Hanson added to party Jennifer Ackerman(pty:pla), Attorney Macy D Hanson added to party Elizabeth Ripoli(pty:pla), Attorney Macy D Hanson added to party Jaime Sweat(pty:pla))(Hanson, Macy)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Julie Queler answer now due 1/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant Julie Queler.(Attorney Scott B Lieberman added to party Julie Queler(pty:dft))(Lieberman, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to GM Law Firm, LLC answer now due 1/11/2019; Chantel L. Grant answer now due 1/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by defendants GM Law Firm, LLC; Chantel L. Grant.(Attorney Randall J Clement added to party GM Law Firm, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Randall J Clement added to party Chantel L. Grant(pty:dft))(Clement, Randall)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed by Defendant Reliant Account Management RAM, LLC.(Attorney Peter J Gimino, III added to party Reliant Account Management RAM, LLC(pty:dft))(Gimino, Peter)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 11, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants Berger Singerman, LLP, Benjamin Zuckerman.(Attorney Joseph John Ybarra added to party Berger Singerman, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John Ybarra added to party Benjamin Zuckerman(pty:dft))(Ybarra, Joseph)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Resolvy, LLC answer now due 1/11/2019; National Legal Staffing Support, LLC answer now due 1/11/2019; Gregory Fishman answer now due 1/11/2019, filed by Defendants Resolvy, LLC; National Legal Staffing Support, LLC; Gregory Fishman.(Attorney Scott B Lieberman added to party Gregory Fishman(pty:dft), Attorney Scott B Lieberman added to party National Legal Staffing Support, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott B Lieberman added to party Resolvy, LLC(pty:dft))(Lieberman, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Daszkal Bolton, LLP, identifying Defendant Daszkal Bolton, LLP ("Defendant") is an individual party to this lawsuit. The undersigned, counsel of Defendant, certifies that no other party has pecuniary interest in the outcome of this case.. (Le Berthon, Adam)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Daszkal Bolton, LLP answer now due 1/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant Daszkal Bolton, LLP.(Attorney Adam Le Berthon added to party Daszkal Bolton, LLP(pty:dft))(Le Berthon, Adam)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Macy D. Hanson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Vivian Grijalva; Evan Wendt; Jasmine Young, and Erinn Sudol, designating Daniel R. Gamez as local counsel. (es)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Macy D. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Vivian Grijalva, Erinn Sudol, Evan Wendt, Jasmine Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22758971) filed by Plaintiff Vivian Grijalva, Erinn Sudol, Evan Wendt, Jasmine Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gamez, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Gamez, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Macy D. Hanson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 as to Defendants Daszkal Bolton, LLP, Berger Singerman, LLP, Gregory Fishman, GM Law Firm, LLC, Chantel L. Grant, Kevin Mason, P.A., Kevin P. Mason, National Legal Staffing Support, LLC, Julie Queler, Reliant Account Management RAM, LLC, Resolvy, LLC, Benjamin Zuckerman. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Vivian Grijalva, Erinn Sudol, Evan Wendt, Jasmine Young. (Gamez, Daniel)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Vivian Grijalva, Erinn Sudol, Evan Wendt, Jasmine Young. (Gamez, Daniel)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22728189 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Evan Wendt, Vivian Grijalva, Jasmine Young, Erinn Sudol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23) (Attorney Daniel Ray Gamez added to party Vivian Grijalva(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Ray Gamez added to party Erinn Sudol(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Ray Gamez added to party Evan Wendt(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Ray Gamez added to party Jasmine Young(pty:pla))(Gamez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivian Grijalva, et al v. Kevin Mason, P.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Legal Staffing Support, LLC
Represented By: Scott B Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Account Management (RAM) Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mason, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Randall J Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Queler
Represented By: Michael Raymond Williams
Represented By: Scott B Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Fishman
Represented By: Scott B Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Zuckerman
Represented By: Joseph John Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantel L Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berger Singerman, LLP
Represented By: Joseph John Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daszkal Bolton, LLP
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David S Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolvy, LLC
Represented By: Scott B Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Business Entity Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantel L. Grant
Represented By: Randall J Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Account Management RAM, LLC
Represented By: Peter J Gimino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Wendt
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Represented By: Daniel Ray Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Grijalva
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Represented By: Daniel Ray Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erinn Sudol
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Represented By: Daniel Ray Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Young
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Represented By: Daniel Ray Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ackerman
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Sweat
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ripoli
Represented By: Macy D Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?