Abelardo Martinez, Jr., et al v. Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Abelardo Martinez, Jr. and Brittney Mejico
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A. and Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02069
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Matsuishi counsel for Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.. Robert T. Matsuishi will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company. (Matsuishi, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.. correcting Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #16 (Lula, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel Friedman Lula counsel for Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.. Changing firm name to Baker Hostetler LLP, 600 Anton Blvd., Suite 900, Costa Mesa, CA 92626. Changing e-mail to dlula@bakerlaw.com. Filed by Defendant BARRINGTON BANK & TRUST. (Lula, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel Friedman Lula counsel for Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.. Changing firm name to Baker Hostetler LLP, 600 Anton Blvd., Suite 900, Costa Mesa, CA 92626. Changing e-mail to dlula@bakerlaw.com. Filed by Defendant BARRINGTON BANK & TRUST COMPANY, N.A.. (Lula, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #14 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Abelardo Martinez, Jr, Brittney Mejico. (Ferrell, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robert T. Matsuishi re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Matsuishi, Robert)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A. answer now due 12/26/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A..(Lula, Daniel)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on November 21, 2018. (Matsuishi, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No.2. The correct event is Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening). You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A., identifying Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A., Wintrust Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation. (Lula, Daniel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Matsuishi counsel for Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. Adding Robert T. Matsuishi as counsel of record for Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Attorney Robert Matsuishi added to party Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.(pty:dft))(Matsuishi, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Friedman Lula counsel for Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. Adding Daniel F. Lula as counsel of record for Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Lula, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Does 1-10. Filed by Plaintiffs Abelardo Martinez, Jr, Brittney Mejico. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/04/2010 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A., re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 served on 11/19/18. (Lula, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filed as PETITION and Notice of Removal with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 11/19/2018, receipt number 0973-22768949), filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Petition and Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Petition and Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Petition and Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Petition and Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Petition and Notice of Removal) (Attorney Daniel Friedman Lula added to party Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.(pty:dft))(Lula, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2018 (lh).
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Lula, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abelardo Martinez, Jr., et al v. Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Bank & Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Friedman Lula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Bank and Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Friedman Lula
Represented By: Robert Matsuishi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Mejico
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?