Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd. v. Ecoolthing Corp
Plaintiff: Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd. and Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Ecoolthing Corp and Ecoolthing Corp doing business as Cool Things Copr
Case Number: 8:2018cv02162
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Farco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ace Gift and Craft (Ningbo) Co., LTD., Plaintiff, designating Jamie M. Cheng as local counsel. (twdb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Farco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22869862) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Farco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22869862) filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Joseph Farco PHV Application) (Cheng, Jamie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Farco. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ecoolthing Corp. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd., (Cheng, Jamie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22852637 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Jamie Mei Cheng added to party Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.(pty:pla))(Cheng, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd. v. Ecoolthing Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Represented By: Joseph A Farco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoolthing Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoolthing Corp doing business as Cool Things Copr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?