Linda T. Wong v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Plaintiff: Linda T. Wong
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02165
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV15-02006 JVS (JCGx). Case transferred from Judge Andrew J. Guilford to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-02165 JVS (KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (lwag)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (car)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Linda T. Wong, (Loker, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Linda T. Wong. (Loker, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Linda T. Wong. (Loker, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22853754 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Linda T. Wong. (Attorney Matthew M Loker added to party Linda T. Wong(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda T. Wong v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda T. Wong
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Wagner
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?