Langer v. Kotsiovos et al

Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Konstantinos V. Kotsiovos, Billy Boy's Cafe, Inc., Georgia K. Kotsiovos and Billy Boys Cafe, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02166
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
1 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(Carson, Chris)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINALSETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On January 30, 2019, counsel for Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement". The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by March 30, 2019. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es)
January 30, 2019 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris)
January 17, 2019 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Konstantinos V. Kotsiovos served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Georgia Kotsiovos - Wife and Co-defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
January 17, 2019 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Billy Boys Cafe, Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Georgia Kotsiovos - Wife and Co-defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
January 9, 2019 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Chris Langer, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #8 served on 01/07/2019. (Carson, Chris)
January 9, 2019 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Georgia K. Kotsiovos served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff, individually or through counsel, to attend a hearing prepared to review how the Court and the parties can meet this requirement in this case. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to be sure that all parties who have been served or have appeared receive this order. Scheduling Conference will take place on 1/31/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 10, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Billy Boys Cafe, Inc., Georgia K. Kotsiovos, Konstantinos V. Kotsiovos. (et)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
December 7, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855842 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langer v. Kotsiovos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantinos V. Kotsiovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Boy's Cafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia K. Kotsiovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Boys Cafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?