Denise Pinkerton v. New Body MD LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Pinkerton
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Sweat, MD, PC, John F. Burnett, Joseph R. Porche, Richard V. Bennett, Richard Francis O'Connor, II, Richard A. Frisk, New Body MD LLC, Javad Tavassoli, Jeffrey Aaron Sweat, New Body MD Physicians Group of California PC, Does 1-100, Rana Foroughi Mobin, Kimberly Cockerham, Tracilea Young, New Body MD of Sacramento LLC, David Ladow and Rick Frisk
Case Number: 8:2018cv02195
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. (es)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff Denise Pinkerton ("Plaintiff"), an individual as attorney in fact for Roger D. Root, individually and as successor in interest to the claims of his deceased spouse Sharon K. Root, filed a complaint in the California Superior Court for the County of Orange ("OCSC") against New Body MD LLC, et al. ("New Body"). (Docket No. 1 at 5). One named defendant, Joseph R. Porche ("Porche"), who is currently incarcerated in Oregon, removed the case to this Court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. (Docket No. 1). Plaintiff now moves to remand the case. (Docket No. 10). Porche does not contest that remand is appropriate. (Docket No. 14). For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (es)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Porche's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 filed by Defendant Joseph R. Porche. (es)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Denise Pinkerton. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO DISMISS DEFENDANT JOSEPH R. PORCHE #2 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Joseph Porche's (1) Motion to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice and (2) Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B) filed by Plaintiff Denise Pinkerton. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Denise Pinkerton. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kenneth J. Catanzarite in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Proof of Service) (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Defendants to underlying superior Court Action. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Setting Briefing Schedule on: Defendant Joseph Porche's Motion to Dismiss (Fld 12-11-18, Dkt 2) Defendant Joseph Porche's Motion to Dismiss (Fld 1-7-18, Dkt 7) by Judge James V. Selna: The Court orders the plaintiff to file and serve its response, to the defendant Joseph Porche's motions to dismiss, on or before January 25, 2019. Defendant Joseph Porche shall file and serve any reply to the plaintiffs response on or before February 15, 2019. This matter shall stand submitted on February 15, 2019 or upon the filing of the defendants reply whichever occurs first. (es)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Joseph R. Porche. (es)
December 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (sbou)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Defendant Joseph R. Porche. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT JOSEPH R. PORCHE UNDER RULE 12 filed by Defendant Joseph R. Porche. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Orange, case number 30-02018-01022310-CU-BC-CJC with copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, filed by Defendant Joseph R. Porche. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denise Pinkerton v. New Body MD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Pinkerton
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Catanzarite
Represented By: Brandon E Woodward
Represented By: Tim James O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Sweat, MD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Porche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Francis O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Frisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Body MD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javad Tavassoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Aaron Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Body MD Physicians Group of California PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rana Foroughi Mobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracilea Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Body MD of Sacramento LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Frisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?