Leslie Flaherty et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Fockler, Mark Rice, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Donald House, Leslie Flaherty, James Smith, Danny Dickerson, Reid Schmitt, James Carpenter, Ricky Montoya, Mica Coleman, Lynn North, Amy Franklin and Joseph McCallister
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation and Hyundai Motor Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv02223
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #26 . Defendants Hyundai Motor America; Hyundai Motor Company; Kia Motors America, Inc.; Kia Motors Corporation's answer due 3/12/2019. (mrgo)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 12, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #23 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Hyundai Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Kia Motors America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Kia Motors Corporation(pty:dft))(Morgan, Shon)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Steve W Berman MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Christopher R Pitoun as local counsel. (jp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carpenter, Mica Coleman, Danny Dickerson, Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Amy Franklin, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Joseph McCallister, Arron Miller, Ricky Montoya, Traci Moore, Lynn North, Mark Rice, Reid Schmitt, James Smith (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23024693) filed by Plaintiffs James Carpenter, Mica Coleman, Danny Dickerson, Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Amy Franklin, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Joseph McCallister, Arron Miller, Ricky Montoya, Traci Moore, Lynn North, Mark Rice, Reid Schmitt, James Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Mark Rice, Robert Fockler, Leslie Flaherty, Traci Moore, Donald House, James Smith, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Amy Franklin, Reid Schmitt, Joseph McCallister, Ricky Montoya, Danny Dickerson, James Carpenter, Mica Coleman, Lynn North(Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party James Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Mica Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Danny Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Amy Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Joseph McCallister(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Ricky Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Lynn North(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Reid Schmitt(pty:pla))(Pitoun, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Traci Moore, Donald House, Mark Rice, Robert Fockler, James Smith, Leslie Flaherty, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, upon Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte/registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pitoun, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Traci Moore, Donald House, Mark Rice, Robert Fockler, James Smith, Leslie Flaherty, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte/registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 16-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 17-00838-JLS (JDEx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: SACV 18-02223-JLS (JDEx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (dv)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kia Motors Corporation. (jp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. (jp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor Company. (jp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (jp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Remove "et al " from the Summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert Hilliard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve W Berman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-00838 (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith, identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Flaherty, Robert Fockler, Donald House, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller, Traci Moore, Mark Rice, James Smith. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22897326 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Traci Moore, Donald House, Mark Rice, Robert Fockler, James Smith, Leslie Flaherty, Dave Loomis, Arron Miller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CLRA Declaration of Leslie Flaherty) (Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Leslie Flaherty(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Robert Fockler(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Donald House(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Dave Loomis(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Arron Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Traci Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Mark Rice(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party James Smith(pty:pla))(Pitoun, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie Flaherty et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fockler
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Loomis
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Miller
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Moore
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald House
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Flaherty
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Dickerson
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Schmitt
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Montoya
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mica Coleman
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn North
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McCallister
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Tina Ting Lo
Represented By: Kari Elizabeth Wohlschlegel
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Tina Ting Lo
Represented By: Kari Elizabeth Wohlschlegel
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Represented By: Tina Ting Lo
Represented By: Kari Elizabeth Wohlschlegel
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Represented By: Tina Ting Lo
Represented By: Kari Elizabeth Wohlschlegel
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?