Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02224
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John D Early
1 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #29 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Protective Order)(Day, M)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Steven R. Katz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Microsoft Corporation Defendant, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (twdb)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Microsoft Corporation Defendant, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (twdb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve R. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23132837) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application) (Scolnick, Chase)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23132691) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application) (Scolnick, Chase)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #18 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC.(Day, M)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Huguenin-Love counsel for Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Adding James Huguenin-Love as counsel of record for Defendant Microsoft Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attorney James Huguenin-Love added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Huguenin-Love, James)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23041113) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
January 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. correcting Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scolnick, Chase)
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation, (Scolnick, Chase)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc 2017 LLC filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scolnick, Chase)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DKT. 10) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On December 28, 2018, Defendant filed a Motion to Consolidate this case with Case No. 8:18-cv-02053. (Dkt. No. #10 .) For reasons of judicial economy and case management, the hearing on the motion will be before Judge Guilford and is CONTINUED from January 28, 2019 to March 4, 2019 at 10:00 am. (es)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 8:18-cv-02053-AG-JDE, #10 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22969431) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV18-01279-AG (JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:18-cv-02224-AG(JDEx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dv)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22969431) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Chase Scolnick added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft)) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 8:18-cv-02053-AG-JDE, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Aamir A Kazi added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft)) (Kazi, Aamir)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant Microsoft Corporation served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge, Authorized to accept for Registered Agent CS-Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Day, M)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, identifying CF Uniloc Holdings LLC. (Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22898014 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney M Elizabeth Day added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Day, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: M Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Marc C Belloli
Represented By: David L Alberti
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Katherine H Reardon
Represented By: Steven R Katz
Represented By: Mukerji Indranil
Represented By: Chase Scolnick
Represented By: James Huguenin-Love
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?