Vans, Inc. et al v. Target Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation and Farylrobin, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02258
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Farylrobin, LLC, Target Corporation, identifying Target Corporation, Farylrobin, LLC, Faryl Gilsoton Morse, Barbara Gilston, Vans, Inc., VF Outdoor, LLC. (Fedalen, James)
February 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Federal Trade Dress Claim filed by Defendant Farylrobin, LLC, Target Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Federal Trade Dress Infringement Claim) (Fedalen, James)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #25 Non-Resident Attorney Kieran G. Doyle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant(s) Target Corporation, Farylrobin, LLC, designating James C Fedalen as local counsel. (es)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kieran G. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Farylrobin, LLC, Target Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23042172) filed by defendant Farylrobin, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney James C Fedalen added to party Farylrobin, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James C Fedalen added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft)) (Fedalen, James)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Quincy L. Kayton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC, designating Greg Nylen as local counsel. (es)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Keith E. Toms APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC, designating Greg Nylen as local counsel. (es)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #19 Non-Resident Attorney James H. Donoian APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC, designating Greg Nylen as local counsel. (es)
January 8, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Quincy L. Kayton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23006182) filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Abbott, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith E. Toms to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23006097) filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Abbott, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James H. Donoian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23005982) filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Abbott, Kevin)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC, designating Greg Nylen as local counsel. (es)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Silverstein, Aaron Y. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs,Vans, Inc. and VF Outdoor, LLC, designating Nylen, Greg as local counsel. (yl)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22977050) filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Abbott, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aya Cieslak-Tochigi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22976460) filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Abbott, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Nylen, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Quincy Kayton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Keith E Toms. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James Donoian. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aya Cieslak-Tochigi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y Silverstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Farylrobin, LLC, Target Corporation. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc., identifying Vans, Inc., plaintiff; VF Outdoor, LLC, plaintiff; VF Corp., parent. (Nylen, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Nylen, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs VF Outdoor, LLC, Vans, Inc.. (Nylen, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22934109 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Vans, Inc., VF Outdoor, LLC. (Attorney Gregory A Nylen added to party VF Outdoor, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory A Nylen added to party Vans, Inc.(pty:pla))(Nylen, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22934109 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Vans, Inc., VF Outdoor, LLC. (Attorney Gregory A Nylen added to party VF Outdoor, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory A Nylen added to party Vans, Inc.(pty:pla))(Nylen, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vans, Inc. et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vans, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A Nylen
Represented By: Aaron Y Silverstein
Represented By: Quincy Kayton
Represented By: Kevin James Abbott
Represented By: James H Donoian
Represented By: Keith E Toms
Represented By: Aya Cieslak-Tochigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VF Outdoor, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A Nylen
Represented By: Aaron Y Silverstein
Represented By: Quincy Kayton
Represented By: Kevin James Abbott
Represented By: James H Donoian
Represented By: Keith E Toms
Represented By: Aya Cieslak-Tochigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: James C Fedalen
Represented By: Kieran G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farylrobin, LLC
Represented By: James C Fedalen
Represented By: Kieran G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?